Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2509723

EP2509723 - ROLL STAND FOR PRODUCING A ROLLED STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2019New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH
Turmstraße 44
4031 Linz / AT
[2015/26]
Former [2012/42]For all designated states
Siemens VAI Metals Technologies GmbH
Turmstrasse 44
4031 Linz / AT
Inventor(s)01 / SEILINGER, Alois
Griesmayrstraße 16a
A-4040 Linz / AT
02 / MINICHMAYR, Robert
Lagerstraße 6
A-4470 Enns / AT
 [2012/42]
Representative(s)Metals@Linz
Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH
Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP
Turmstraße 44
4031 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Maier, Daniel Oliver
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2012/42]Maier, Daniel Oliver
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date10775807.004.11.2010
WO2010EP66776
Priority number, dateAT2009000195510.12.2009         Original published format: AT 19552009
[2012/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011069756
Date:16.06.2011
Language:DE
[2011/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2509723
Date:17.10.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011
[2012/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2509723
Date:15.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:B21B13/14, B21B27/02
[2012/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WALZGERÜST ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WALZBAND[2012/42]
English:ROLL STAND FOR PRODUCING A ROLLED STRIP[2012/42]
French:CAGE DE LAMINOIR POUR FABRIQUER DU RUBAN DE LAMINAGE[2012/42]
Entry into regional phase25.05.2012National basic fee paid 
25.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/42]
10.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
15.04.2014Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
07.05.2014Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted
09.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.09.2014Fee for grant paid
05.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.07.2015  16.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
SMS group GmbH
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Kross, Ulrich
Hemmerich & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Hammerstraße 2
57072 Siegen / DE
 [2019/52]
Former [2015/34]
Opponent(s)01  13.07.2015  16.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
SMS group GmbH
Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Meissner, Peter E.
Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89
14199 Berlin / DE
19.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.05.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition10.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1557/17
10.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
03.12.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
03.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
09.12.2019Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.11.2010
AL15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MK15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
GB15.01.2015
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU04.11.2010
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MK15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
GB15.01.2015
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/33]HU04.11.2010
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
GB15.01.2015
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/32]HU04.11.2010
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
IE04.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
GB15.01.2015
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/28]BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
IE04.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
GB15.01.2015
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/22]CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
IE04.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
GB15.01.2015
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2016/12]CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
IE04.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
GB15.01.2015
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/51]CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
IE04.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR15.12.2014
GB15.01.2015
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/48]CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
IE04.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GB15.01.2015
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/46]CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
IE04.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/37]CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/36]CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/35]CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/33]CY15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/30]CY15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
BE30.11.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/26]CY15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/24]ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/23]ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
Former [2015/16]NL15.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE3602698  (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 2; figure 2 * [Y] 12;
 [Y]WO2007144161  (SIEMENS VAI METALS TECH GMBH [AT], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 4; figure 6 *;
 [Y]JPS6192704  (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO03022470  (VOEST ALPINE IND ANLAGEN [AT], et al) [Y] 12 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 4 *
by applicantWO2007144162
 WO03022470