EP2459940 - SOLAR ABSORBER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, SOLAR COLLECTOR, SOLAR INSTALLATION, RETROFIT KIT, AND METHOD FOR RETROFITTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hertler, Günter Schillerstrasse 22 71111 Waldenbuch / DE | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Sebastian, Jens ABACUS Patentanwälte Lise-Meitner-Straße 21 72202 Nagold / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Sebastian, Jens Ott & Sebastian Graf-Bentzel-Straße 36 D-72108 Rottenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10776532.3 | 29.07.2010 | WO2010DE00888 | Priority number, date | DE20091035116 | 29.07.2009 Original published format: DE102009035116 | [2012/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011012117 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2459940 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/26 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
F24S10/70 (EP,US);
F24S10/755 (EP);
F24S25/00 (EP);
F24S70/20 (EP,US);
F24S80/40 (EP);
F24S80/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | SOLARABSORBER UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG, SOLARKOLLEKTOR, SOLARANLAGE, NACHRÜSTSATZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR NACHRÜSTUNG | [2012/23] | English: | SOLAR ABSORBER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, SOLAR COLLECTOR, SOLAR INSTALLATION, RETROFIT KIT, AND METHOD FOR RETROFITTING | [2012/23] | French: | ABSORBEUR SOLAIRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, COLLECTEUR SOLAIRE, INSTALLATION SOLAIRE, LOT DE RATTRAPAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE EN RATTRAPAGE | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 18.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 09.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.2012 | 31.07.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1688683 (FENIS TEKNIK UERUENLER A S [TR]) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract ** page 2, column 1, paragraph 11 - page 3, column 3, paragraph 14 *; | [XI]US2007084460 (BECKMAN VAUGHN [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11-16 * page 2, paragraph 13; figures 11, 12 * * page 4, paragraph 34 * * page 4, paragraph 38 * * page 5, paragraph 51 - paragraph 58 * * page 6, paragraph 78 * * page 7, paragraph 86 * * page 8, paragraph 94 * [I] 17,18; | [XI]WO2007066245 (ACKTAR LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,4-16 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 35 - paragraph 36 * * page 7, paragraph 57 - page 9, paragraph 65 * [I] 17,18; | [X]DE102006010578 (ACM COATINGS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 3 - paragraph 6 * * page 2, paragraph 11 - page 3, paragraph 27 * * page 4, paragraph 40 - paragraph 44 * |