Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2514131

EP2514131 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR RECONFIGURING MAPPING OF CARRIER INDICATOR FILED TO COMPONENT CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.10.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2012/43]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / LARSSON, Daniel
Storgatan 50
S-171 52 Solna / SE
02 / BALDEMAIR, Robert
Ängkärrsgatan 3
S-171 70 Solna / SE
03 / GERSTENBERGER, Dirk
Birger Jarlsgatan 113 C
S-113 56 Stockholm / SE
04 / PARKVALL, Stefan
Västmannagatan 53
S-113 25 Stockholm / SE
 [2012/43]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2012/43]Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Kista RAN 1
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date10776839.220.09.2010
WO2010SE51005
Priority number, dateUS20090286138P14.12.2009         Original published format: US 286138 P
[2012/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011075037
Date:23.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2514131
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011
[2012/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00
[2012/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR NEUKONFIGURIERUNG DER ZUORDNUNG EINES TRÄGERINDIKATORFELDES ZU EINEM KOMPONENTENTRÄGER[2012/43]
English:METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR RECONFIGURING MAPPING OF CARRIER INDICATOR FILED TO COMPONENT CARRIER[2012/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT POUR RECONFIGURER LA CORRESPONDANCE ENTRE LE CHAMP INDICATEUR DE PORTEUSE ET LA PORTEUSE DE COMPOSANT[2012/43]
Entry into regional phase05.07.2012National basic fee paid 
05.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.10.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/43]
06.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2018Date of oral proceedings
09.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
09.03.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination04.05.2018Appeal received No.  T1786/18
18.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP18170736.5  / EP3396889
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XI]  - PHILIPS, "PDCCH design and monitoring set for carrier aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-094990, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091109), no. Jeju; 20091109, XP050389344 [X] 1,5,7,11 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,6,8-10,12
 [XI]  - NOKIA ET AL, "Carrier aggregation configurations and DL/UL linkage", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-094642, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091109), no. Jeju; 20091109, XP050389048 [X] 1,5,7,11 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,6,8-10,12
 [I]  - CATT, "Carrier activation and de-activation", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-096502, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091109), no. Jeju; 20091109, XP050391089 [I] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [I]  - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "Autonomous CC selection for heterogeneous environments", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-094659_ACCS_HETNET_V02, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091109), no. Jeju; 20091109, XP050389064 [I] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [I]  - NOKIA CORPORATION ET AL, "Basic CC configuration in Carrier Aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-096812, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091109), no. Jeju; 20091109, XP050391263 [I] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - CATT ET AL, "Design of DL Control Channel for LTE-A with Carrier Aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-092785, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090624), no. Los Angeles, USA; 20090624, XP050351239 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *