Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2514131

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure09.03.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Entry into regional phase05.07.2012National basic fee paid 
05.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
27.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Appeal following examination04.05.2018APPEAL FILED
18.06.2018APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:24.10.2012 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20120705
 
Event date:24.10.2012 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:20.03.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:27.07.2016 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20160624