EP2640409 - A SYNERGISTIC COMPOSITION OF PLANT EXTRACTS FOR TREATING SKIN DISEASES INVOLVING ABNORMAL CELL GROWTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitro-Bio Sarl ZAC de Lavaur 63500 Issoire / FR | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHRIVASTAVA, Ravi 43 bis route de Chateaugay F-63118 Cebazat / FR | 02 /
SHRIVASTAVA, Christiane 43 bis route de Chateaugay F-63118 Cebazat / FR | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Larcher, Dominique Cabinet Vidon, 16 B, rue Jouanet, BP 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10777043.0 | 19.11.2010 | WO2010EP67861 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012065651 | Date: | 24.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2640409 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/19, A61K36/16, A61K36/537, A61P17/06 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
A61K38/19 (EP);
A61K36/16 (EP);
A61K36/185 (EP);
A61K36/28 (EP);
A61K36/45 (EP);
A61K36/48 (EP);
A61K36/537 (EP);
A61K36/76 (EP);
A61K36/82 (EP);
A61K36/87 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/1611 (EP);
A61K9/703 (EP);
A61L15/44 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61L2300/414 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/16, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/185, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/28, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/45, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/48, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/537, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/76, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/82, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | SYNERGISTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG VON PFLANZENEXTRAKTEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HAUTERKRANKUNGEN MIT ANOMALEM ZELLWACHSTUM | [2013/39] | English: | A SYNERGISTIC COMPOSITION OF PLANT EXTRACTS FOR TREATING SKIN DISEASES INVOLVING ABNORMAL CELL GROWTH | [2013/39] | French: | COMPOSITION SYNERGIQUE D'EXTRAITS DE PLANTES DESTINÉE AU TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES CUTANÉES IMPLIQUANT UNE CROISSANCE CELLULAIRE ANORMALE | [2013/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 12.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 13.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.02.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 19.06.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2013 | 30.11.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH092960 ; | [Y]JP2001139453 ; | [Y]WO2006029484 (AJINOMOTO OMNICHEM S A [BE], et al) [Y] 1-8 *cf. page 2, section [0003], page 4, section [0011], page 6, section [0013], page 10, section [0025], page 14, lines 10-20, pages 20/21, section [0043], claims 1, 12-14 and 18*; | [X]WO2007059441 (OLALDE RANGEL JOSE ANGEL [US]) [X] 1-8 *cf. abstract, page 2, lines 20-23, page 6, 2nd para., page 10, 2nd para., page 11, 2nd para., table 1 on page 12, page 14, lines 7-16, table 2 on page 15, page 19, lines 18-25, claims 1/14 and 17*; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 11, Database accession no. 1997-115207, XP002629274 & JPH092960 A 19970107 (WATANABE SANSHOTEN KK) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 56, Database accession no. 2001-505519, XP002629275 & JP2001139453 A 20010522 (ISEHAN KK) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * |