Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2483422

EP2483422 - METHOD OF PREPARING A REACTION MIXTURE AND RELATED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.11.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thermo Fisher Scientific Baltics UAB
V.A. Graiciuno 8
02241 Vilnius / LT
[2013/47]
Former [2012/32]For all designated states
Finnzymes Oy
Ratastie 2
01620 Vantaa / FI
Inventor(s)01 / KURKELA, Jaakko
c/o Finnzymes Oy
Ratastie 2
01620 Vantaa / FI
02 / EKLIN, Katja
c/o Finnzymes Oy
Ratastie 2
01620 Vantaa / FI
03 / UUSIVIRTA, Sanna
c/o Finnzymes Oy
Ratastie 2
01620 Vantaa / FI
 [2013/25]
Former [2012/32]01 / KURKELA, Jaakko
c/o Finnzymes Oy
Ratastie 2
FI-01620 Vantaa / FI
02 / EKLIN, Katja
c/o Finnzymes Oy
Ratastie 2
FI-01620 Vantaa / FI
03 / UUSIVIRTA, Sanna
c/o Finnzymes Oy
Ratastie 2
FI-01620 Vantaa / FI
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Former [2013/45]Luoto, Kristian Reinhold , et al
Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Former [2012/32]Arvela, Sakari Mikael
Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date10777044.804.10.2010
WO2010FI50772
Priority number, dateFI2009000601302.10.2009         Original published format: FI 20096013
[2012/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011039425
Date:07.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2483422
Date:08.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011
[2012/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2483422
Date:04.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, G01N21/25
[2012/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REAKTIONSMISCHUNGEN UND DEREN PRODUKTE[2013/24]
English:METHOD OF PREPARING A REACTION MIXTURE AND RELATED PRODUCTS[2012/32]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN MÉLANGE DE RÉACTION ET PRODUITS CORRESPONDANTS[2012/32]
Former [2012/32]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER REAKTIONSMISCHUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDE PRODUKTE
Entry into regional phase25.04.2012National basic fee paid 
25.04.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/32]
04.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2013Fee for grant paid
20.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.09.2014  13.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
PO Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus
Brienner Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2019/41]
Former [2017/51]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.2014  13.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
PO Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Brienner Strasse 1
80333 München / DE
Former [2017/50]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.2014  13.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
PO Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Brienner Str. 1
80333 München / DE
Former [2016/13]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.2014  13.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
PO Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Opponent's representative
Breuer, Markus
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Erika-Mann-Straße 23
80636 München / DE
Former [2015/35]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.2014  13.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
PO Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Opponent's representative
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2014/42]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.2014   
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau N.V.
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS Den Haag / NL
Opponent's representative
Korsten, Marius
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS The Hague / NL
13.10.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.05.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition15.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1655/16
16.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
11.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1655/16
15.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.10.2010
AL04.12.2013
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MK04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
IE04.10.2014
LU04.10.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU04.10.2010
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MK04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
IE04.10.2014
LU04.10.2014
Former [2016/33]HU04.10.2010
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
MT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
IE04.10.2014
LU04.10.2014
Former [2016/32]HU04.10.2010
AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
TR04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
IE04.10.2014
LU04.10.2014
Former [2016/28]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
BG04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
GR05.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
IE04.10.2014
LU04.10.2014
Former [2016/22]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
SM04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
IE04.10.2014
LU04.10.2014
Former [2015/46]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
IE04.10.2014
LU04.10.2014
Former [2015/27]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
MC04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
LU04.10.2014
Former [2015/26]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
LU04.10.2014
Former [2015/14]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SI04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/48]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
DK04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/37]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
CZ04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
ES04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
PL04.12.2013
RO04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
SK04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
PT04.04.2014
Former [2014/36]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
EE04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
IS04.04.2014
Former [2014/34]AT04.12.2013
BE04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/26]AT04.12.2013
CY04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/25]AT04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
LV04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT04.12.2013
FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
RS04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI04.12.2013
HR04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI04.12.2013
LT04.12.2013
NL04.12.2013
SE04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Former [2014/20]LT04.12.2013
NO04.03.2014
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2007088506  (CLONIT S R L [IT], et al) [AD] 1-34 * see whole doc. esp. p.6, 4. par *;
 [A]WO9506137  (AUSTRALIAN RED CROSS [AU], et al) [A] 1-34 * see whole doc. esp. claims *;
 [A]US2006039000  (SACCHI FABRICIO D A [BR]) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6942964
 KR20020045167
 US6153412
 US5565339
 WO2007088506