Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2622075

EP2622075 - USE OF MIRNAS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS, PROPHYLAXIS, TREATMENT AND FOLLOW-UP OF DISEASES INVOLVING MACROAUTOPHAGY ABNORMALITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Database last updated on 20.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, IE, LI, LU
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sabanci Universitesi
Orhanli, Tuzla
34956 Istanbul / TR
[2013/32]
Inventor(s)01 / GOZUACIK, Devrim
Sabanci Universitesi
Muhendislik ve Doga Bilimleri Fakultesi Biyolojik
Bilimler ve Biyokimya Muhendisligi Programi
Orhanli, Tuzla
34956 Istanbul / TR
02 / KORKMAZ, Gozde
Sabanci Universitesi
Muhendislik ve Doga Bilimleri Fakultesi Biyolojik
Bilimler ve Biyokimya Muhendisligi Programi
Orhanli, Tuzla
34956 Istanbul / TR
 [2013/32]
Representative(s)Sevinç, Erkan
Istanbul Patent A.S.
Plaza-33, Büyükdere Cad. No: 33/16
Sisli
34381 Istanbul / TR
[2016/09]
Former [2013/32]Sevinç, Erkan
Istanbul Patent & Trademark Consultancy Ltd.
Plaza-33, Büyükdere cad. No: 33/16
Sisli
34381 Istanbul / TR
Application number, filing date10777121.427.09.2010
[2016/09]
WO2010TR00192
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012044265
Date:05.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2622075
Date:07.08.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012
[2013/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2622075
Date:02.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/09]
Search report(s)International search reportEP05.04.2012
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/113, C12Q1/68, A61K31/7105
[2013/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/32]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON MIRNA ZUR DIAGNOSE, PROPHYLAXE, BEHANDLUNG UND NACHSORGE VON ERKRANKUNGEN MIT MAKROAUTOPHAGISCHEN ANOMALIEN[2013/32]
English:USE OF MIRNAS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS, PROPHYLAXIS, TREATMENT AND FOLLOW-UP OF DISEASES INVOLVING MACROAUTOPHAGY ABNORMALITIES[2013/32]
French:UTILISATION D'ARNMI POUR DIAGNOSTIQUER, PRÉVENIR, TRAITER ET SUIVRE LES MALADIES IMPLIQUANT DES ANOMALIES DE TYPE MACRO-AUTOPHAGIE[2013/32]
Entry into regional phase22.04.2013National basic fee paid 
22.04.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
22.04.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/32]
18.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
26.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2015Fee for grant paid
18.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2014
Opposition(s)05.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
12.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
MC02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
IE27.09.2016
LU27.09.2016
CH30.09.2016
LI30.09.2016
[2017/41]
Former [2017/31]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
MC02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2017/16]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2017/07]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2016/49]AT02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2016/48]AT02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2016/40]AT02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
Former [2016/35]ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2010055487  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5,9-12 * pages 7-9,29 - pages 86-88; table 2 *;
 [X]US2010010072  (DMITROVSKY ETHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-12,18,22 * paragraphs [0228] , [0331] - [0336] - [0377] - [0387] *;
 [X]WO2007103808  (UNIV OHIO STATE [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-12,18,22 * claims 1-11, 40-57 *;
 [A]WO2007051316  (BRITISH COLUMBIA CANCER AGENCY [CA], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [ID]  - ZHU HUA ET AL, "Regulation of autophagy by a beclin 1-targeted microRNA, miR-30a, in cancer cells.", AUTOPHAGY AUG 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19535919, (200908), vol. 5, no. 6, ISSN 1554-8635, pages 816 - 823, XP002637509 [ID] 1-23 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KOUKOURAKIS M I ET AL, "Beclin 1 over- and underexpression in colorectal cancer: distinct patterns relate to prognosis and tumour hypoxia.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER 12 OCT 2010 LNKD- PUBMED:20842118, (20100914), vol. 103, no. 8, ISSN 1532-1827, pages 1209 - 1214, XP002637510 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.BJC.6605904