Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2433143

EP2433143 - MULTI-DIRECTIONAL MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
[2016/09]
Former [2012/13]For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HERR, Amy E.
14330 Skyline Blvd
Oakland, California 94619 / US
02 / HE, Mei
405 Red Oak Avenue 101
Albany, California 94706 / US
03 / HOU, Chenlu
1620 Walnut Street
Berkeley, California 94709 / US
 [2012/13]
Representative(s)Wilkinson, Stephen John
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins
1 St. Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[2016/09]
Former [2012/13]Wilkinson, Stephen John
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
Application number, filing date10778282.318.05.2010
[2016/09]
WO2010US35314
Priority number, dateUS20090179649P19.05.2009         Original published format: US 179649 P
US20090257361P02.11.2009         Original published format: US 257361 P
[2012/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010135364
Date:25.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2433143
Date:28.03.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2010
[2012/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2433143
Date:02.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR24.02.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01N35/08, G01N33/543, G01N33/53
[2012/48]
Former International [2012/13]G01N35/08, G01N33/53
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MULTIDIREKTIONALE MIKROFLUIDISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN[2012/13]
English:MULTI-DIRECTIONAL MICROFLUIDIC DEVICES AND METHODS[2012/13]
French:DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS MICROFLUIDIQUES MULTIDIRECTIONNELS[2012/13]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2011National basic fee paid 
14.10.2011Search fee paid 
14.10.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2011Examination requested  [2012/13]
13.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2015Fee for grant paid
02.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.08.2015
Opposition(s)05.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.05.2010
AL02.03.2016
AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CY02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
MC02.03.2016
MK02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
TR02.03.2016
IE18.05.2016
LU18.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/32]HU18.05.2010
AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CY02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
MC02.03.2016
MK02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
TR02.03.2016
IE18.05.2016
LU18.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2018/29]HU18.05.2010
AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CY02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
MC02.03.2016
MK02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
TR02.03.2016
IE18.05.2016
LU18.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2018/28]HU18.05.2010
AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CY02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
MC02.03.2016
MK02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
IE18.05.2016
LU18.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2017/26]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
IE18.05.2016
LU18.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
FR31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2017/15]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SI02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
LU18.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
BG02.06.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2017/07]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
DK02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
LU18.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2017/04]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
LU18.05.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT02.03.2016
BE02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
IT02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
PT04.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT02.03.2016
CZ02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
RO02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
SK02.03.2016
SM02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2016/49]AT02.03.2016
EE02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2016/48]AT02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
IS02.07.2016
Former [2016/40]AT02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
NL02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
LV02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
SE02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT02.03.2016
ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
LT02.03.2016
PL02.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
Former [2016/35]ES02.03.2016
FI02.03.2016
HR02.03.2016
NO02.06.2016
GR03.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0073799  (CALIPER TECHN CORP [US]; PARCE WALLACE J [US]; HODGE NICHOLAS C [US];) [A] 1-15 * page 17, line 26 - page 18, line 7; figure 1 * * page 31, line 3 - page 32, line 15; figure 6 *
International search[A]US6499499  (DANTSKER, EUGENE ET AL.);
 [A]  - LERCH, MARGARET A. ET AL., "Electrokinetic Fluid Control in Two-Dimensional Planar Microfluidic Devices", ANAL. CHEM., (20070825), vol. 79, no. 19, pages 7485 - 7491, XP008154055

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac071003y
 [A]  - ZENG, YONG ET AL., "Microfluidic Self-Patterning of Large-Scale Crystalline Nanoarrays for High-Throughput Continuous DNA Fractionation", ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (20080715), vol. 47, pages 6388 - 6391, XP008154057

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200812345
 [A]  - FONSLOW, BRYAN R. ET AL., "Free-Flow Electrophoresis on an Anodically Bonde d Glass Microchip", ANAL. CHEM., (20050901), vol. 77, no. 17, pages 5706 - 5710, XP008154056

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac050766n
by applicantUS6499499
 WO0073799
    - LERCH M., ANAL. CHEM., vol. 79, no. 19, pages 7485 - 7491
    - ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., vol. 47, pages 6388 - 6391
    - ANAL. CHEM., vol. 77, no. 17, pages 5706 - 5710