Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2490681

EP2490681 - THE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION IN DRY POWDER FORM FOR INHALATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.02.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sima Patent ve Lisanslama Hizmetleri Ltd.Sti.
Yildiz Teknik Üniversitesi
Davutpasa Kampüsü
Teknoloji Gelistirme Bölgesi D Blok K:3
Esenler/Istanbul / TR
[2013/46]
Former [2012/35]For all designated states
Bilgic, Mahmut
Yildiz Teknik Universitesi
Davutpasa Kampusu
Teknoloji Gelistirme Bolgesi
D Blok
34220 Esenler-Istanbul / TR
Inventor(s)01 / BILGIC, Mahmut
Yildiz Teknik Universitesi
Davutpasa Kampusu
Teknoloji Gelistirme Bolgesi
D Blok
34220 Esenler-Istanbul / TR
 [2015/36]
Former [2012/35]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/35](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date10778746.720.10.2010
[2015/45]
WO2010TR00209
Priority number, dateTR2009000791320.10.2009         Original published format: TR 200907913
[2012/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011049540
Date:28.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/17]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2490681
Date:29.08.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011
[2012/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2490681
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/137, A61K9/00, A61K31/58
[2012/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE TROCKENPULVERZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM INHALIEREN[2012/35]
English:THE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION IN DRY POWDER FORM FOR INHALATION[2012/35]
French:COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE SOUS FORME DE POUDRE SECHE[2015/36]
Former [2012/35]COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE SOUS FORME DE POUDRE SÈCHE
Entry into regional phase07.05.2012National basic fee paid 
07.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/35]
20.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2015Fee for grant paid
31.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.02.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.08.2016  11.08.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstasse 2
81541 Munich / DE
Opponent's representative
Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 [2016/37]
12.09.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.01.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.02.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.02.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.04.2018Appeal received No.  T1096/18
25.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
08.12.2014Request for further processing filed
10.12.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.12.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
15.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.10.2010
AL04.11.2015
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
BG04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
GB20.10.2016
IE20.10.2016
LU20.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
DE03.05.2017
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU20.10.2010
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
BG04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
GB20.10.2016
IE20.10.2016
LU20.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
DE03.05.2017
Former [2018/34]HU20.10.2010
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
GB20.10.2016
IE20.10.2016
LU20.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
DE03.05.2017
Former [2018/28]HU20.10.2010
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
GB20.10.2016
IE20.10.2016
LU20.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
DE03.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
GB20.10.2016
IE20.10.2016
LU20.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
DE03.05.2017
Former [2017/40]AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
GB20.10.2016
LU20.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
DE03.05.2017
Former [2017/03]AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES04.11.2015
IT04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007012871  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,15,16 * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 15, paragraph 9 - page 17, paragraph 1; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2004009963  (HORSTMAN DONALD HERBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,15,16 * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] *;
 [X]US2003018019  (MEADE CHRISTOPHER J M [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,15,16 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0036] , [0037] , [0040]; claim 3 *;
 [X]WO2008102128  (CIPLA LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,15,16 * page 6, paragraphs 1,2; examples 35-39 *;
 [Y]WO2005053648  (MICRODRUG AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-9,15,16 * page 16, paragraph 2; figures 4,5 * * page 19, paragraph 3 * * page 20 *;
 [Y]WO0178739  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-9,15,16 * page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 4 *
ExaminationUS2009314291
by applicantWO2007012871
 WO2007068900
 WO2005011408
OppositionWO2011049540
 WO2006066908
 WO2007012871
 US2009314291
 WO2004041672
 US2008197045
    - BROADHEAD et al., "Dry-powder inhalers: evaluation of testing methodology and effect of inhaler design", Pharmaceutica Acta Helvetiae, (19950000), vol. 70, pages 125 - 131, XP002683629

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-6865(95)00005-T
    - DARQUENNE, "Particle deposition in the lung", (20060000), pages 300 - 304, URL: http://www.ssnpstudents.com/wp/wp-content/uploads/ 2015/02/00 259.pdf
    - HESS et al., "A Guide to Aerosol Delivery Devices - For Resporatory Therapists", Respironics, (20070000), pages 1 - 41
    - NEWMAN et al., "Therapeutic aerosols 1 - Physical and practical considerations", Thorax, (19830000), vol. 83, pages 881 - 886, XP055299704

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/thx.38.12.881
    - "Case Law of the Boards of Appeal of the European Patent Office", reflect common general knowledge of a person skilled in the art at the filing/priority date of the opposed patent in view of the principles set forth, (20130900), page 74
    - represents a submission of the Proprietor during the examination proceedings
    - represent prior art under Article 54(2) EPC