Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2534623

EP2534623 - DEVICE FOR DISPLAYING PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.04.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. OG
Weiberndorf 20
6380 St. Johann in Tirol / AT
[2015/27]
Former [2012/51]For all designated states
Fritz Egger GmbH & Co. OG
Tiroler Strasse 16
3105 Unterradlberg / AT
Inventor(s)01 / HÖGLAUER, Hubert
Am Grasanger 8
83317 Teisendorf / DE
 [2012/51]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/51]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date10779257.419.10.2010
WO2010EP65723
Priority number, dateDE20102002077U08.02.2010         Original published format: DE 202010002077 U
[2012/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011095238
Date:11.08.2011
Language:DE
[2011/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2534623
Date:19.12.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011
[2012/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/00
[2012/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/51]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR VISUALISIERUNG VON DEKOREN[2012/51]
English:DEVICE FOR DISPLAYING PATTERNS[2012/51]
French:DISPOSITIF DE VISUALISATION DE DÉCORS[2012/51]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2012National basic fee paid 
19.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.11.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/51]
29.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.04.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination15.07.2014Appeal received No.  T1982/14
02.09.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.10.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
17.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
22.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
21.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[IL]  - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europ�ischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 �ber Gesch�ftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqu� de l'Office europ�en des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les m�thodes dans le domaine des activit�s �conomiques", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS., OEB, MUNCHEN., DE, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * [L] 1-14