Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2637630

EP2637630 - ORAL CARE PRODUCT AND METHODS OF USE AND MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/38]For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEWUS, Catherine
22 Union Hill Road
Denville New Jersey 07834 / US
02 / SZEWCZYK, Gregory
29 Aberdeen Circle
Flemington New Jersey 08822 / US
03 / MELLO, Sarita
202 Concord Place
North Brunswick New Jersey 08902 / US
04 / SMITH-WEBSTER, Kimdra
30 Chinkapin Court
Williamstown New Jersey 08094 / US
05 / NESTA, Jason
30 Boulevard Road
Cedar Knolls New Jersey 07927 / US
06 / DILLON, Rensl
3 Beth Ann Way
Ewing New Jersey 08638 / US
07 / ARVANITIDOU, Evangelia S.
16 Jackson Avenue
Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US
08 / CUIULE, Christine
2 Ardleigh Court
Mount Laurel New Jersey 08904 / US
 [2013/38]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/38]Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date10779423.212.11.2010
WO2010US56514
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012064339
Date:18.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2637630
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012
[2013/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/03, A61K8/34, A61K8/36, A61K8/368, A61K8/49, A61Q11/00
[2013/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/38]
TitleGerman:MUNDPFLEGEPRODUKTE UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEREN VERWENDUNG UND HERSTELLUNG[2013/38]
English:ORAL CARE PRODUCT AND METHODS OF USE AND MANUFACTURE THEREOF[2013/38]
French:PRODUIT DE SOIN BUCCAL ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION ET DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI[2013/38]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2013National basic fee paid 
29.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/38]
19.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.06.2017
21.06.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
12.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination12.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2664/17
21.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
20.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.03.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201304   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]US5283056  (CHUNG SIEW L [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,10-14 * example II, formulation no. 2 *;
 [XY]CN1977801  (WUHAN HUIYANG BIOTECHNOLOGY CO [CN]) [X] 1,3-7,10-14 * paragraph "invention content" * [Y] 4,8,9;
 [XY]WO9951093  (INNOSCENT LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,3-6,11-14 * example 5 * * formulation 6 * [Y] 4,8,9;
 [X]EP1797860  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [X] 1,3,4,12-14 * examples 5,6 *;
 [Y]WO2009152507  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [Y] 4,8,9 * examples *;
 [Y]  - DISCLOSED ANONYMOUSLY, "Ingredient combinations in two phase oral rinse preparations", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (20080601), vol. 530, no. 19, ISSN 0374-4353, page 486, XP007138223 [Y] 4,8,9 * tables 1-3 *
by applicantUS2009311200
 US5283056
 CN1977801
 WO9951093
 EP1797860
 WO2009152507
 JPH05262631
 US3535421
 US4885155
 US3678154
 US5000939
 US4992420
 US4355022
 US4154815
 US4058595
 US3991177
 US3696191
    - Research Disclosure, MASON PUBLICATIONS, (20080601), vol. 530, page 486
    - "Database GNPD Mintel Database Accession"