Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2501907

EP2501907 - ROTOR, IN PARTICULAR FOR A CAMSHAFT ADJUSTER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A ROTOR AND DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE ANGLE OF ROTATION OF A CAMSHAFT RELATIVE TO A CRANKSHAFT OF AN ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.07.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
[2015/10]
Former [2014/12]For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Former [2012/39]For all designated states
Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 1-3
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ARNOLD, Mario
Rainsberg 8
91086 Aurachtal / DE
 [2012/39]
Application number, filing date10779750.810.11.2010
WO2010EP67167
Priority number, dateDE2009105360017.11.2009         Original published format: DE102009053600
[2012/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011061100
Date:26.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2501907
Date:26.09.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2011
[2012/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2501907
Date:20.08.2014
Language:DE
[2014/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:F01L1/344
[2012/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROTOR, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN NOCKENWELLENVERSTELLER, VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES ROTORS SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DREHWINKELVERSTELLUNG EINER NOCKENWELLE GEGENÜBER EINER KURBELWELLE EINES MOTORS[2012/39]
English:ROTOR, IN PARTICULAR FOR A CAMSHAFT ADJUSTER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A ROTOR AND DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE ANGLE OF ROTATION OF A CAMSHAFT RELATIVE TO A CRANKSHAFT OF AN ENGINE[2012/39]
French:ROTOR, EN PARTICULIER POUR UN DÉPHASEUR D'ARBRE À CAMES, PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UN ROTOR ET DISPOSITIF POUR AJUSTER L'ANGLE DE ROTATION D'UN ARBRE À CAMES PAR RAPPORT À UN VILEBREQUIN D'UN MOTEUR[2012/39]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2012National basic fee paid 
18.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/39]
02.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2014Fee for grant paid
10.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.10.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.05.2015  05.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
GKN Sinter Metals Engineering GmbH/GKN Sinter Metals GmbH (Bad Brückenau)/GKN Sinter Metals GmbH (Radevormwald)
Krebsöge 10/Industriestrasse 1/Krebsöge 10
42477 Radevormwald/97769 Bad Brückenau/
42477 Radevormwald / DE
Opponent's representative
Rössler, Matthias
Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
(Karo IP Professionals)
Postfach 32 01 02
40416 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2018/25]
Former [2018/08]
Opponent(s)01  21.05.2015  05.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
GKN Sinter Metals Engineering GmbH/GKN Sinter Metals GmbH (Bad Brückenau)/GKN Sinter Metals GmbH (Radevormwald)
Krebsöge 10/Industriestrasse 1/Krebsöge 10
42477 Radevormwald/97769 Bad Brückenau/
42477 Radevormwald / DE
Opponent's representative
Rössler, Matthias
Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 32 01 02
40416 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/51]
Opponent(s)01  21.05.2015  05.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
GKN Sinter Metals Engineering GmbH/GKN Sinter Metals GmbH (Bad Brückenau)/GKN Sinter Metals GmbH (Radevormwald)
Krebsöge 10/Industriestrasse 1/Krebsöge 10
42477 Radevormwald/97769 Bad Brückenau/
42477 Radevormwald / DE
Opponent's representative
KNH Patentanwälte
Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine
PartG mbB
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/28]
Opponent(s)01  21.05.2015   
GKN Sinter Metals Engineering GmbH/GKN Sinter Metals GmbH (Bad Brückenau)/GKN Sinter Metals GmbH (Radevormwald)
Krebsöge 10/Industriestrasse 1/Krebsöge 10
42477 Radevormwald/97769 Bad Brückenau/
42477 Radevormwald / DE
Opponent's representative
Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
26.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.10.2015Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
29.02.2016Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
11.07.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition30.08.2016Appeal received No.  T2029/16
28.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
01.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.11.2010
AL20.08.2014
CY20.08.2014
CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
MK20.08.2014
MT20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SI20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
SM20.08.2014
TR20.08.2014
IE10.11.2014
LU10.11.2014
BG20.11.2014
GB20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
AT10.11.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU10.11.2010
CY20.08.2014
CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
MK20.08.2014
MT20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SI20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
SM20.08.2014
TR20.08.2014
IE10.11.2014
LU10.11.2014
BG20.11.2014
GB20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
AT10.11.2015
Former [2017/19]HU10.11.2010
CY20.08.2014
CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
MT20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SI20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
SM20.08.2014
TR20.08.2014
IE10.11.2014
LU10.11.2014
BG20.11.2014
GB20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
AT10.11.2015
Former [2016/33]HU10.11.2010
CY20.08.2014
CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
MT20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SI20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
SM20.08.2014
TR20.08.2014
IE10.11.2014
LU10.11.2014
BG20.11.2014
GB20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2016/32]HU10.11.2010
CY20.08.2014
CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SI20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
SM20.08.2014
TR20.08.2014
IE10.11.2014
LU10.11.2014
BG20.11.2014
GB20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2016/31]CY20.08.2014
CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SI20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
SM20.08.2014
IE10.11.2014
LU10.11.2014
BG20.11.2014
GB20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2016/22]CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SI20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
SM20.08.2014
IE10.11.2014
LU10.11.2014
BG20.11.2014
GB20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/50]CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SI20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
IE10.11.2014
LU10.11.2014
BG20.11.2014
GB20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR01.12.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/48]CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
IE10.11.2014
LU10.11.2014
BG20.11.2014
GB20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/46]CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
IE10.11.2014
LU10.11.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/33]CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
LU10.11.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/32]CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
LU10.11.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/30]CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
LU10.11.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/24]CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
PL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/23]CZ20.08.2014
DK20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/22]DK20.08.2014
ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
IT20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/16]ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
NL20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/12]ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
RS20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/11]ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
SE20.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT20.08.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1568856  (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102007038400  (AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA K [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102005026553  (HYDRAULIK RING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102006059656  (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0801212  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantDE19938596