Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2435057

EP2435057 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING LIPID COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  02.10.2015
Database last updated on 18.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 04.11.2015  [2015/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
New Chapter, Inc.
90 Technology Drive
Brattleboro, VT 05301 / US
For all designated states
Board of Regents of the University of Texas System
201 West 7th Street
Austin, TX 78701 / US
[2012/14]
Inventor(s)01 / NEWMAN, Robert, A.
112 Whale Rock Lane
Surry, ME 04684 / US
02 / YANG, Peiying
5215 Riverstone Crossing Drive
Surgar Land, TX / US
03 / SCHULICK, Paul
90 Technology Drive
Brattleboro, VT / US
 [2012/14]
Representative(s)Engisch, Gautier , et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2013/10]Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte
Hafenspitze
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2012/14]Michalski, Stefan
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date10781334.728.05.2010
WO2010US36712
Priority number, dateUS20090213334P29.05.2009         Original published format: US 213334 P
US20090272130P19.08.2009         Original published format: US 272130 P
[2012/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010138902
Date:02.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2435057
Date:04.04.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010
[2012/14]
Search report(s)International search reportUS02.12.2010
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP31.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/53, A61K35/60, A61P3/06, A61P35/00
[2012/48]
Former International [2012/14]A61K36/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/14]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODULIERUNG EINER LIPIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2012/14]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING LIPID COMPOSITION[2012/14]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À MODULER LA COMPOSITION LIPIDIQUE[2012/14]
Entry into regional phase28.12.2011National basic fee paid 
28.12.2011Search fee paid 
28.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/14]
06.03.2013Observations by third parties
07.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.07.2015
17.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/45]
27.06.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/45]
09.07.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)EP15170548.0  / EP2946784
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.03.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[IP]WO2009150179  (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [IP] 1,3-8,14-18 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - SAMIR P MEHTA, "Effect of n-3 polyunsaturated fatty acids on Barrett's epithelium in the human lower esophagus", AM J CLIN NUTR, (20080401), vol. 87, pages 949 - 959, XP055041381 [Y] 1,3-8,14-18 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - DRBECKL2, "Skin Cancer Forum - wild oregano oil - skin cancer testimonies", INTERNET CITATION, (20080526), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.topicalinfo.org/forum/topic.asp?TOPIC_ID=308, (20100723), XP002593576 [Y] 1,3-8,14-18 * the whole document *
 [X]  - anonymous, "OxyOrega by NAHS", (20090302), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20090302133851/http://www.taoofherbs.com/products/3317/NorthAmericanHerbSpice/OxyOrega.htm, (20121018), XP002685500 [X] 1 * the whole document *
 [YD]  - HARDMAN, "Omega-3 fatty acids to augment cancer therapy.", THE JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (20021101), vol. 132, no. 11 Suppl, ISSN 0022-3166, pages 3508S - 3512S, XP055041415 [YD] 1,3-8,14-18 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2007042059  (NEWMARK THOMAS [US], et al);
 [Y]US6451341  (SLAGA THOMAS J [US], et al);
 [Y]US2006020007  (BERLIN ROGER [US]);
 [Y]  - GAO ET AL., "Reversal of Angiogenesis In Vitro, Induction of Apoptosis, and Inhibition of Akt Phosphorylation in Endothelial Cells by Thromboxane A2", CIRC. RES., (20001027), vol. 87, pages 739 - 745, XP008148766

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.RES.87.9.739
 [Y]  - HAN ET AL., "Dietary Polyphenols and Their Biological Significance", INT. J. MOL. SCI, (2007), vol. 8, pages 950 - 988, XP002530334
by applicant   - YANG, P. ET AL., J. LIPID RES., (2004),
    - JOSEPH C. MAROON, M.D.; JEFFREY BOST, The Natural Anti-Inflammatory, PAC. BASIC HEALTH PUBLICATIONS, (2006),
    - E. STAHL; K. W. QUIRIN; D. GERARD, Dense Gases for Extraction and Refining, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1988), page 4,
    - JOSEPH C. MAROON'S, Fish Oil. The Natural Anti-Inflammatory, (2006),
    - PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (20080916), vol. 105, no. 37, pages 13811 - 6,
    - TERÉS S; BARCELO-COBLIJN G; BENET M; ALVAREZ R; BRESSANI R; HALVER JE; ESCRIBA PV., Laboratory of Molecular Cell Biomedicine, INSTITUT UNIVERSITARI D'LNVESTIGACIONS EN CIENCIES DE LA SALUT,
    - ANN ONCOL., (200503), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 359 - 71,
    - AM J CLIN NUTR., (199807), vol. 68, no. L, pages 134 - 41,
    - SIMONSEN NR; FERNANDEZ-CREHUET NAVAJAS J; MARTIN-MORENO JM; STRAIN JJ; HUTTUNEN JK; MARTIN BC; THAMM M; KARDINAAL AF; VAN'T VEER P, "Tissue stores of individual monounsaturated fatty acids and breast cancer: the EURAMIC study", EUROPEAN COMMUNITY MULTICENTER STUDY ON ANTIOXIDANTS, MYOCARDIAL INFARCTION, AND BREAST CANCER,
    - CHARLTON KM; CORNER AH; DAVEY K; KRAMER JK; MAHADEVAN S; SAUER FD, "Cardiac lesions in rats fed rapeseed oils", CAN J COMP MED., (197507), vol. 39, no. 3, pages 261 - 9,
    - ACTA MED SCAND SUPPL., (1975), vol. 585, pages 5 - 13,
    - CLIN EXP PHARMACOL PHYSIOL., (200412), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 37 - 8,
    - HIRAOKA-YAMAMOTO J; IKEDA K; NEGISHI H; MORI M; HIROSE A; SAWADA S; ONOBAYASHI Y; KITAMORI K; KITANO S; TASHIRO M, FRONTIER HEALTH SCIENCE, URL: junko@mwu.mukogawa-u.ac.jp,
    - J NUTR., (200902), vol. 139, no. 2, pages 215 - 21,
    - MATTHAN NR; DILLARD A; LECKER JL; IP B; LICHTENSTEIN AH, Cardiovascular Nutrition Laboratory, JEAN MAYER USDA HUMAN NUTRITION RESEARCH CENTER ON AGING AT TUFTS UNIVERSITY,
    - "Differential protective effects of palmitoleic acid and cAMP on caspase activation and cell viability in pancreatic beta-cells exposed to palmitate", WELTERS HJ; DIAKOGIANNAKI E; MORDUE JM; TADAYYON M; SMITH SA; MORGAN NG, Apoptosis, INSTITUTE OF BIOMEDICAL AND CLINICAL SCIENCE, (200607), vol. 11, pages 1231 - 8,
    - "Distinct effects of saturated and monounsaturated fatty acids on beta-cell turnover and function", MAEDLER K; SPINAS GA; DYNTAR D; MORITZ W; KAISER N; DONATH MY, Diabetes, DIVISION OF ENDOCRINOLOGY AND DIABETES, (200101), vol. 50, pages 69 - 76,
    - "Palmitoleic acid isomer (C16:ldelta6) in human skin sebum is effective against gram-positive bacteria", WILLE JJ; KYDONIEUS A., Skin Pharmacol Appl Skin Physiol., BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB CO., (200305), vol. 16, pages 176 - 87,
    - S. KARGER AG, BASEL PROSTAGLANDINS LEUKOT ESSENT FATTY ACIDS, (200602), vol. 74, no. 2, pages 149 - 56,
    - CAO H; GERHOLD K; MAYERS JR; WIEST MM; WATKINS SM; HOTAMISLIGIL GS, Identification of a lipokine, a lipid hormone linking adipose tissue to systemic metabolism, HARVARD SCHOOL OF PUBLIC HEALTH, (20080919), vol. 134, pages 933 - 44,
    - "Myristoleic acid, a cytotoxic component in the extract from Serenoa repens, induces apoptosis and necrosis in human prostatic LNCaP cells", IGUCHI K; OKUMURA N; USUI S; SAJIKI H; HIROTA K; HIRANO K., Prostate, LABORATORY OF PHARMACEUTICS, GIFU PHARMACEUTICAL UNIVERSITY, (200104), vol. 47, pages 59 - 65,
    - FEMS YEAST RES., (200703), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 276 - 85,
    - "The inhibitory action of fatty acids on oral bacteria", SHAPIRO S., Oral Microbiol Immunol., INSTITUT FUR ORALE MIKROBIOLOGIE UND ALLGEMEINE IMMUNOLOGIE, (199610), vol. 11, pages 350 - 355,
    - Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, vol. 5, pages 857 - 884,
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1990), pages 1435 - 1712,
    - M. A. MICALLEF, European Journal of Clinical Nutrition,
    - SINGH, S.; AGGARWAL, B.B., "Activation of transcription factor NF-kappa B is suppressed by curcumin (diferuloylmethane) [corrected", J BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 24995 - 25000,
    - AGGARWAL, S.; ICHIKAWA, H.; TAKADA, Y.; SANDUR, S.K.; SHISHODIA, S.; AGGARWAL, B.B., "Curcumin (diferuloylmethane) down-regulates expression of cell proliferation and antiapoptotic and metastatic gene products through suppression of I kappa B alpha kinase and Akt activation", MOL. PHARMACOL., (2006), vol. 69, pages 195 - 206,
    - PLUMMER, S.M.; HOLLOWAY, K.A.; MANSON, M.M.; MUNKS, R.J.; KAPTEIN, A.; FARROW, S.; HOWELLS, L., "Inhibition of cyclooxygenase 2 expression in colon cells by the chemopreventive agent curcumin involves inhibition of NF kappa B activation via the NIK/IKK signalling complex", ONCOGENE, (1999), vol. 18, pages 6013 - 6020,
    - PASCHKA, A.G.; BUTLER, R.; YOUNG, C.Y., "Induction of apoptosis in prostate cancer cell lines by the green tea component, (-)-epigallocatechin-3-gallate", CANCER LETT, (1998), vol. 130, doi:doi:10.1016/S0304-3835(98)00084-6, pages 1 - 7, XP002117137

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3835(98)00084-6
    - KIM, D.S.; KIM, H.R.; WOO, E.R.; HONG, S.T.; CHAE, H.J.; CHAE, S.W., "Inhibitory effects of rosmarinic acid on adriamycin-induced apoptosis in H9c2 cardiac muscle cells by inhibiting reactive oxygen species and the activations of c-Jun N-terminal kinase and extracellular signal-regulated kinase", BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (2005), vol. 70, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bcp.2005.06.026, pages 1066 - 1078, XP005066009

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bcp.2005.06.026
    - HUANG, S.S.; ZHENG, R.L., "Rosmarinic acid inhibits angiogenesis and its mechanism of action in vitro", CANCER LETT., (2005),
    - SHISHODIA, S.; MAJUMDAR, S.; BANERJEE, S.; AGGARWAL, B.B., "Ursolic acid inhibits nuclear factor-kappaB activation induced by carcinogenic agents through suppression of I kappa B alpha kinase and p65 phosphorylation: correlation with down-regulation of cyclooxygenase 2, matrix metalloproteinase 9, and cyclin D1", CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 63, pages 4375 - 4383,
    - CHOI, Y.H.; BAEK, J.H.; YOO, M.A.; CHUNG, H.Y.; KIM, N.D.; KIM, K.W., "Induction of apoptosis by ursolic acid through activation of caspases and downregulation of c-IAPs in human prostate epithelial cells", INT. J ONCOL., (2000), vol. 17, pages 565 - 571,
    - KIM, S.O.; KUNDU, J.K.; SHIN, Y.K.; PARK, J.H.; CHO, M.H.; KIM, T.Y.; SURH, Y.J., "6]-Gingerol inhibits COX-2 expression by blocking the activation ofp38 MAP kinase and NF-kappaB in phorbol ester-stimulated mouse skin", ONCOGENE, (2005), vol. 24, pages 2558 - 2567,
    - ATSUMI, T.; MURAKAMI, Y.; SHIBUYA, K., TONOSAKI, K. AND FUJISAWA, S. (2005) INDUCTION OF CYTOTOXICITY AND APOPTOSIS AND INHIBITION, ANTICANCER RES., vol. 25, pages 4029 - 4036,
    - TJENDRAPUTRA, E.; TRAN, V.H.; LIU-BRENNAN, D.; ROUFOGALIS, B.D.; DUKE, C.C., "Effect of ginger constituents and synthetic analogues on cyclooxygenase-2 enzyme in intact cells", BIOORG. CHEM., (2001), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1006/bioo.2001.1208, pages 156 - 163, XP055015234

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bioo.2001.1208
    - MANNA, S.K.; MUKHOPADHYAY, A.; AGGARWAL, B.B., "Resveratrol suppresses TNF-induced activation of nuclear transcription factors NF-kappa B, activator protein-1, and apoptosis: potential role of reactive oxygen intermediates and lipid peroxidation", J IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, pages 6509 - 6519, XP002313010
    - FUKUDA, K.; HIBIYA, Y.; MUTOH, M.; KOSHIJI, M.; AKAO, S.; FUJIWARA, H., "Inhibition by berberine of cyclooxygenase-2 transcriptional activity in human colon cancer cells", J ETHNOPHARMACOL., (1999), vol. 66, pages 227 - 233,
    - KELM, M.A.; NAIR, M.G.; STRASBURG, G.M.; DEWITT, D.L., "Antioxidant and cyclooxygenase inhibitory phenolic compounds from Ocimum sanctum Linn", PHYTOMEDICINE, (2000), vol. 7, pages 7 - 13,
    - BEMIS, D.L.; CAPODICE, J.L.; ANASTASIADIS, A.G.; KATZ, A.E.; BUTTYAN, R., "Zyflamend, a unique herbal preparation with nonselective COX inhibitory activity, induces apoptosis of prostate cancer cells that lack COX-2 expression", NUTR. CANCER., (2005), vol. 52, doi:doi:10.1207/s15327914nc5202_10, pages 202 - 212, XP009088430

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1207/s15327914nc5202_10
    - AGGARWAL, B.B., "Nuclear factor-kappaB: the enemy within", CANCER CELL, (2004), vol. 6, pages 203 - 208,
    - ANTO, R.J.; MUKHOPADHYAY, A.; SHISHODIA, S.; GAIROLA, C.G.; AGGARWAL, B.B., "Cigarette smoke condensate activates nuclear transcription factor-kappaB through phosphorylation and degradation ofIkappaB(alpha): correlation with induction of cyclooxygenase-2", CARCINOGENESIS, (2002), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1093/carcin/23.9.1511, pages 1511 - 1518, XP002551491

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/carcin/23.9.1511
    - BHARTI, A.C.; TAKADA, Y.; SHISHODIA, S.; AGGARWAL, B.B., "Evidence that receptor activator of nuclear factor (NF)-kappaB ligand can suppress cell proliferation and induce apoptosis through activation of a NF-kappaBindependent and TRAF6-dependent mechanism", J BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M308062200, pages 6065 - 6076, XP009143759

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M308062200
    - TAKADA, Y.; ICHIKAWA, H.; BADMAEV, V.; AGGARWAL, B.B., "Acetyl-11-ketobeta- boswellic acid potentiates apoptosis, inhibits invasion, and abolishes osteoclastogenesis by suppressing NF-kappaB and NF-kappaB-regulated gene expression", J IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 176, pages 3127 - 3140,
    - CHATURVEDI, M.M.; MUKHOPADHYAY, A.; AGGARWAL, B.B., "Assay for redox-sensitive transcription factor", METHODS ENZYMOL., (2000), vol. 319, pages 585 - 602,
    - ABU-AMER, Y.; TONDRAVI, M.M., "NF-kappaB and bone: the breaking point", NAT. MED., (1997), vol. 3, pages 1189 - 1190,
    - LIOTTA, L.A.; THORGEIRSSON, U.P.; GARBISA, S., "Role of collagenases in tumor cell invasion", CANCER METASTASIS REV., (1982), vol. 1, pages 277 - 288,
    - VAN ANTWERP, D.J.; MARTIN, S.J.; KAFRI, T.; GREEN, D.R.; VERMA, I.M., "Suppression of TNF-alpha-induced apoptosis by NF-kappaB", SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 787 - 789,
    - WANG, C.Y.; MAYO, M.W.; BALDWIN, A.S., JR., "TNF- and cancer therapyinduced apoptosis: potentiation by inhibition ofNF-kappaB", SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 784 - 787,
    - YAMAMOTO, K.; ARAKAWA, T.; UEDA; YAMAMOTO, S., "Transcriptional roles of nuclear factor kappa B and nuclear factor-interleukin-6 in the tumor necrosis factor alpha-dependent induction of cyclooxygenase-2 in MC3T3-El cells", J BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 31315 - 31320,
    - ESTEVE, P.O.; CHICOINE, E.; ROBLEDO, 0.; AOUDJIT, F.; DESCOTEAUX, A.; POTWOROWSKI, E.F.; ST-PIERRE, Y., "Protein kinase C-zeta regulates transcription of the matrix metalloproteinase-9 gene induced by IL-1 and TNF-alpha in glioma cells via NF-kappa B", J BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 35150 - 35155,
    - VAN DE STOLPE, A.; CALDENHOVEN, E.; STADE, B.G.; KOENDERMAN, L.; RAAIJMAKERS, J.A.; JOHNSON, J.P.; VAN DER SAAG, P.T., "12-0-tetradecanoylphorbol-13-acetate and tumor necrosis factor alpha-mediated induction of intercellular adhesion molecule- is inhibited by dexamethasone. Functional analysis of the human intercellular adhesion molecular-1 promoter", J BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 6185 - 6192,
    - ZHU, L.; FUKUDA, S.; CORDIS, G.; DAS, D.K.; MAULIK, N., "Anti-apoptotic protein survivin plays a significant role in tubular morphogenesis of human coronary arteriolar endothelial cells by hypoxic preconditioning", FEBS LETT., (2001), vol. 508, doi:doi:10.1016/S0014-5793(01)03084-8, pages 369 - 374, XP004324271

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(01)03084-8
    - CHU, Z.L.; MCKINSEY, T.A.; LIU, L.; GENTRY, J.J.; MALIM, M.H.; BALLARD, D.W., "Suppression of tumor necrosis factor-induced cell death by inhibitor of apoptosis c-IAP2 is under NF- kappaB control", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1997), vol. 94, pages 10057 - 10062,
    - YOU, M.; KU, P.T.; HRDLICKOVA, R.; BOSE, H.R., JR., "ch-IAPl, a member of the inhibitor-of-apoptosis protein family, is a mediator of the antiapoptotic activity of the v-Rel oncoprotein", MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 17, pages 7328 - 7341,
    - CATZ, S.D.; JOHNSON, J.L., "Transcriptional regulation of bcl-2 by nuclear factor kappa B and its significance in prostate cancer", ONCOGENE, (2001), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1038/sj.onc.1204926, pages 7342 - 7351, XP002970747

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1204926
    - STEHLIK, C.; DE MARTIN, R.; KUMABASHIRI, I.; SCHMID, J.A.; BINDER, B.R.; LIPP, J., "Nuclear factor (NF)-kappaB-regulated X-chromosome-linked iap gene expression protects endothelial cells from tumor necrosis factor alpha-induced apoptosis", J EXP. MED., (1998), vol. 188, pages 211 - 216,
    - TAMATANI, M.; CHE, Y.H.; MATSUZAKI, H.; OGAWA, S.; OKADO, H.; MIYAKE, S.; MIZUNO, T.; TOHYAMA, M., "Tumor necrosis factor induces Bcl-2 and Bclx expression through NFkappaB activation in primary hippocampal neurons", J BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 8531 - 8538,
    - SCHWENZER, R.; SIEMIENSKI, K.; LIPTAY, S.; SCHUBERT, G.; PETERS, N.; SCHEURICH, P.; SCHMID, R.M.; WAJANT, H., "The human tumor necrosis factor (TNF) receptor-associated factor 1 gene (TRAF 1) is up-regulated by cytokines of the TNF ligand family and modulates TNF-induced activation of NF-kappaB and c- Jun N-terminal kinase", J BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 19368 - 19374,
    - KREUZ, S.; SIEGMUND, D.; SCHEURICH, P.; WAJANT, H., "NF-kappaB inducers upregulate cFLIP, a cycloheximide-sensitive inhibitor of death receptor signaling.", MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2001), vol. 21, doi:doi:10.1128/MCB.21.12.3964-3973.2001, pages 3964 - 3973, XP008074029

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.21.12.3964-3973.2001
    - SHISHODIA, S.; AGGARWAL, B.B., "Nuclear factor-kappaB activation mediates cellular transformation, proliferation, invasion angiogenesis and metastasis of cancer", CANCER TREAT RES., (2004), vol. 119, pages 139 - 173,
    - TAKADA, Y.; SINGH, S.; AGGARWAL, B.B., "Identification of a p65 peptide that selectively inhibits NF-kappa B activation induced by various inflammatory stimuli and its role in down- regulation of NF-kappaB-mediated gene expression and up-regulation of apoptosis", J BIOL. CHEM, (2004), vol. 279, pages 15096 - 15104,
other   - "Satalagunaah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RS/4487, XP003030709
    - Brhat Nighantu Ratnakara (Saligramanighantubhusanam), (1997), vol. 4, page 227,
    - "Safoof -e- Marzanjosh", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AA7/181, XP003030710
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD.BIN ZAKARIYYA AL-RAZI, Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, (1958), vol. VII, page 37,
    - "Dawa-e- Iklil-ul- Jabal", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/166A, XP003030711
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1896), vol. I, page 188,
    - "Dawa-e- Marzanjosh", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AA6/1049, XP003030712
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD.BIN ZAKARIYYA AL-RAZI, Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, (1958), vol. VI, page 285,
    - "Safoof-e- Muhazzil", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MA3/307, XP003027444
    - MOHAMMAD KABIRUDDIN, Bayaaz-e- Kabir, (1938), vol. II, page 92,
    - "Dawa-al- Misk Shireen", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/2014, XP003030713
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, (1928), pages 295 - 296,