Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2501454

EP2501454 - METHOD FOR FORMING A FILTER MAT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.01.2016
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hydac Filtertechnik GmbH
Industriegebiet
66280 Sulzbach/Saar / DE
[2013/21]
Former [2012/39]For all designated states
Hydac Fluidtechnik GmbH
Industriegebiet
66280 Sulzbach/Saar / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MEES, Harald
Falscheider Str. 52
66822 Lebach / DE
 [2012/39]
Representative(s)Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte
Lange Strasse 51
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/39]Bartels, Martin Erich Arthur , et al
Patentanwälte Bartels & Partner Lange Strasse 51
D-70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date10781621.719.11.2010
WO2010EP07040
Priority number, dateDE2009105407720.11.2009         Original published format: DE102009054077
[2012/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011060949
Date:26.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2501454
Date:26.09.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2011
[2012/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:B01D29/11, B29C65/08, B29C65/16
[2012/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/39]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG EINER FILTERMATTE[2012/39]
English:METHOD FOR FORMING A FILTER MAT[2012/39]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR FORMER UN MAT FILTRANT[2012/39]
Entry into regional phase26.04.2012National basic fee paid 
26.04.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
26.04.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.2012Examination requested  [2012/39]
09.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination15.09.2017Appeal received No.  T0165/18
23.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
02.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.10.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
02.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[XYI]EP1249182  (EUL & GUENTHER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-9,12 * the whole document * [Y] 9-11,13-15,17,18 [I] 16;
 [X]US6451205  (MCGAW JR STEVEN B [US]) [X] 1,4,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 28 * * column 3, lines 25-33 * * column 5, lines 45-47 * * column 6, lines 27-35 *;
 [XY]EP0498364  (GORINI GIUSEPPE [IT]) [X] 1,3,12,14,15 * column 1, lines 4, 33-41 * [Y] 17,18;
 [XY]US5632831  (STULL ROBERT [US]) [X] 1,12 * abstract * [Y] 17,18;
 [Y]WO03009922  (HYDAC FILTERTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 9-11,13 * abstract *;
 [A]US2007051461  (PFLEGING WILHELM [DE], et al) [A] 16 * figure 4; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5418035  (IGUCHI MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 16 * column 10, lines 44-50; figure 7 *;
 [Y]EP0139822  (KURASHIKI BOSEKI KK [JP]) [Y] 9-11,14,15,17,18 * page 4, lines 6-19; figures 1-4 * * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 9 * * page 9, line 6 - page 10, line 4 * * page 12, lines 5-10 *;
 [Y]JPH08230833  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [Y] 9-11,13 * abstract *;
 JPH08230833  [ ];
 [YA]CA2553464  (PUROLATOR FILTERS NA LLC [US]) [Y] 17 * abstract * [A] 16
    [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 46, Database accession no. 1996-460813, & JPH08230833 A 19960910 (KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO KK) [ ] * abstract *
by applicantDE4202769
 EP0522692
 WO0105483