Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2499414

EP2499414 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING A LINER IN A PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.02.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Repiper AB
Flöjelbergsgatan 12
431 37 Mölndal / SE
[2016/44]
Former [2012/38]For all designated states
Röranalysgruppen I Europa AB
Flöjelsbergsgatan 12
431 37 Mölndal / SE
Inventor(s)01 / NILSSON, Göran
Stenstigen 13
S-179 61 Stenhamra / SE
02 / HEDBERG, Sam
Pastor Ödmans väg 91
S-134 60 INGARÖ / SE
 [2012/38]
Representative(s)Nordic Patent Service A/S
Bredgade 30
1260 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2012/38]Nordic Patent Service A/S
Højbro Plads 10
1200 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date10782540.803.11.2010
WO2010EP06697
Priority number, dateSE2009000143310.11.2009         Original published format: SE 0901433
[2012/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011057734
Date:19.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2499414
Date:19.09.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011
[2012/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2499414
Date:09.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:F16L55/165, F16L55/18
[2012/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR INSTALLATION EINER AUSKLEIDUNG IN EINEM ROHR[2012/38]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING A LINER IN A PIPE[2012/38]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR INSTALLER UNE GAINE DANS UN TUYAU[2012/38]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2012National basic fee paid 
11.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/38]
07.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2013Observations by third parties
10.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2014Fee for grant paid
25.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.01.2015  20.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Trelleborg Pipe Seals Duisburg GmbH
Dr.-Alfred-Herrhausen-Allee 36
47228 Duisburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Flügel Preissner Schober Seidel
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 20a
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/07]
Opponent(s)01  05.01.2015   
Trelleborg Pipe Seals Duisburg GmbH
Dr.-Alfred-Herrhausen-Allee 36
47228 Duisburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 20
80335 München / DE
17.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.06.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
17.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.02.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition12.04.2017Appeal received No.  T0961/17
19.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL09.04.2014
MK09.04.2014
RO09.04.2014
SM09.04.2014
BG09.07.2014
GR10.07.2014
IS09.08.2014
CY03.11.2015
MC30.11.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]MK09.04.2014
RO09.04.2014
SM09.04.2014
BG09.07.2014
GR10.07.2014
IS09.08.2014
CY03.11.2015
MC30.11.2015
Former [2016/35]RO09.04.2014
SM09.04.2014
BG09.07.2014
GR10.07.2014
IS09.08.2014
CY03.11.2015
MC30.11.2015
Former [2016/28]RO09.04.2014
SM09.04.2014
BG09.07.2014
GR10.07.2014
IS09.08.2014
MC30.11.2015
Former [2016/22]RO09.04.2014
SM09.04.2014
BG09.07.2014
GR10.07.2014
IS09.08.2014
Former [2015/11]RO09.04.2014
BG09.07.2014
GR10.07.2014
IS09.08.2014
Former [2014/50]BG09.07.2014
GR10.07.2014
IS09.08.2014
Former [2014/49]BG09.07.2014
IS09.08.2014
Former [2014/48]BG09.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[Y]US6102120  (CHEN KUO-CHIANG [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 58 * * column 9, line 61 - line 67 * * column 11, line 13 - line 14 * * figures 2-5 *;
 [YA]WO9319322  (BARRY BROS SPEC SERVICES [AU]) [Y] 1-6,10-12,18 * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 4 * * page 8, line 17 - line 29 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 7,15,17;
 [YA]AU2008202558  (SIDELINER ENTPR PTY LTD) [Y] 7-9,13-17 * page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 2 * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 3 * * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 3 * * page 13, line 11 - page 14, line 10 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1-3,10,18;
 [A]DE20318292U  (HUNGER IBAK H GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,5,12,18 * paragraph [0010] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4417428  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,8,12 * abstract * * figure 1 *
by applicantWO2004079251
otherUS6276398
 US2004144439