Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2491295

EP2491295 - LINEAR LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OSRAM GmbH
Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6
80807 München / DE
[2013/16]
Former [2013/08]For all designated states
OSRAM GmbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Former [2012/35]For all designated states
OSRAM AG
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LEINEWEBER, Werner
Dohrgaulerstr. 5
51688 Wipperfürth / DE
02 / SCHACHERER, Friedbert
Niederwipper 65
51688 Wipperfürth / DE
 [2012/35]
Representative(s)Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner , et al
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
[2019/33]
Former [2012/35](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date10784300.525.11.2010
[2019/33]
WO2010EP68232
Priority number, dateDE2009105585526.11.2009         Original published format: DE102009055855
[2012/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011064305
Date:03.06.2011
Language:DE
[2011/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2491295
Date:29.08.2012
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2011
[2012/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2491295
Date:14.08.2019
Language:DE
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:F21K99/00, H01K1/24, F21Y103/00, F21Y115/10, F21Y103/10, F21K9/275
[2019/14]
Former International [2012/35]F21K99/00, H01K1/24, F21Y103/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LINIENLAMPE[2012/35]
English:LINEAR LAMP[2012/35]
French:LAMPE LINÉAIRE[2012/35]
Entry into regional phase09.05.2012National basic fee paid 
09.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/35]
31.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2019Fee for grant paid
04.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
29.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
29.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2009027916  (HUANG MING-CHUNG [TW], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]WO0249075  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [A]US2006215422  (LAIZURE ROBERT S JR [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010]; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]US5463280  (JOHNSON JAMES C [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 24; figures 1-10 *
by applicantDE1919505U