Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2505041

EP2505041 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR POLARISING A DBD ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/40]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR POLARIZING A DBD ELECTRODE
[2013/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2014
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGC Glass Europe
Avenue Jean Monnet 4
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2014/18]
Former [2014/11]For all designated states
AGC Glass Europe
Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166
1170 Bruxelles (Watermael-Boitsfort) / BE
Former [2012/40]For all designated states
AGC Glass Europe
Chaussée de la Hulpe, 166
1170 Bruxelles (Watermael-Boitsfort) / BE
For all designated states
Leclercq, Joseph
AGC Glass Europe R&D Centre Rue de l'Aurore 2
6040 Jumet / BE
Inventor(s)01 / MICHEL, Eric
AGC Glass Europe
R&D Centre
Rue de l'Aurore 2
B-6040 Jumet / BE
02 / TIXHON, Eric
AGC Glass Europe
R&D Centre
Rue de l'Aurore 2
B-6040 Jumet / BE
03 / LECLERCQ, Joseph
AGC Glass Europe
R&D Centre
Rue de l'Aurore 2
B-6040 Jumet / BE
 [2014/11]
Former [2012/40]01 / MICHEL, Eric
AGC Glass Europe
R&D Centre
Rue de l'Aurore 2
B-6040 Jumet / BE
02 / TIXHON, Eric
AGC Glass Europe
R&D Centre
Rue de l'Aurore 2
B-6040 Jumet / BE
Representative(s)Larangé, Françoise
AGC Glass Europe
Technovation Centre
IP Department
Rue Louis Blériot, 12
6041 Gosselies / BE
[N/P]
Former [2012/47]Larangé, Françoise
AGC Glass Europe
R&D Centre - IP department
Rue de l'Aurore, 2
6040 Jumet / BE
Former [2012/40]Larangé, Françoise
ARC-IP sprl rue Emile Francqui, 4
1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE
Application number, filing date10784500.023.11.2010
WO2010EP68049
Priority number, dateEP2009017694024.11.2009         Original published format: EP 09176940
EP2010015344812.02.2010         Original published format: EP 10153448
[2012/40]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011064217
Date:03.06.2011
Language:FR
[2011/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2505041
Date:03.10.2012
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2011
[2012/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2505041
Date:18.09.2013
Language:FR
[2013/38]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP2505041
Date:23.04.2014
[2014/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:H05H1/24
[2012/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR POLARISIERUNG EINER DBD-ELEKTRODE[2013/18]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR POLARISING A DBD ELECTRODE[2013/18]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE POLARISATION D'UNE ÉLECTRODE DBD[2012/40]
Former [2012/40]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR POLARISATION EINER DBD-ELEKTRODE
Former [2012/40]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR POLARIZING A DBD ELECTRODE
Entry into regional phase25.06.2012National basic fee paid 
25.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/40]
10.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2013Fee for grant paid
24.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2013
Opposition(s)19.06.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.09.2013
AT18.09.2013
BG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
ES18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
MK18.09.2013
MT18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
SM18.09.2013
TR18.09.2013
IE23.11.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2016/32]AT18.09.2013
BG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
ES18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
MK18.09.2013
MT18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
SM18.09.2013
TR18.09.2013
IE23.11.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2015/41]AT18.09.2013
BG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
ES18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
MK18.09.2013
MT18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
SM18.09.2013
IE23.11.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2015/35]AT18.09.2013
BG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
ES18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
MK18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
SM18.09.2013
IE23.11.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2015/33]AT18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
ES18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
MK18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
SM18.09.2013
IE23.11.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2015/25]AT18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
ES18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
SM18.09.2013
IE23.11.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/48]AT18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
ES18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
IE23.11.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/41]AT18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
ES18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/33]AT18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
ES18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/28]AT18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
ES18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/24]AT18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
ES18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
Former [2014/23]CY18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
Former [2014/22]CY18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY11.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
RS18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
NO18.12.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY11.09.2013
HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
NO18.12.2013
Former [2014/09]HR18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
NO18.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT18.09.2013
NO18.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO18.12.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]US6416633  (SPENCE PAUL D [US]) [A] 1,9,10,15 * column 3, line 7 - line 37 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 11 * * column 11, line 20 - column 12, line 26 * * figures 1,9 *;
 [A]CA2506787  (GUANGDONG J TECH SCIENCE DEV C [CN]) [A] 1,3,4,14 * page 3, paragraph 4 * * figure 3; claims 1,4 *;
 [AP]EP2180768  (TNO NL ORGANISATIE VOOR TOEGEP [NL]) [AP] 1,13 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0049] * * figure 3 *