Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2440455

EP2440455 - WINGTIP AND SPONSON INTERACTION ON AN AMPHIBIOUS AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
23.09.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Icon Aircraft, Inc.
12511 Beatrice Street
Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US
[2012/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KARKOW, Jon
101a Commercial Way
Tehachapi CA 93561 / US
02 / HAWKINS, Kirk
12511 Beatrice Street
Los Angeles CA 90066 / US
03 / GIONTA, Matthew
101a Commercial Way
Tehachapi CA 93561 / US
04 / STRAND, Steen
12511 Beatrice Street
Los Angeles CA 90066 / US
 [2012/16]
Representative(s)Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2012/16]Moore, Barry , et al
Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date10786579.202.06.2010
WO2010US37014
Priority number, dateUS2009048233610.06.2009         Original published format: US 482336
[2012/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010144280
Date:16.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2440455
Date:18.04.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010
[2012/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.12.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B64C35/00, B64C3/56
[2013/42]
Former International [2012/16]B64C35/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/16]
TitleGerman:FLÜGELSPITZEN- UND SPONSON-INTERAKTION IN EINEM AMPHIBIENFLUGZEUG[2012/16]
English:WINGTIP AND SPONSON INTERACTION ON AN AMPHIBIOUS AIRCRAFT[2012/16]
French:INTERACTION DE BOUT D'AILE ET DE NAGEOIRE SUR UN AVION AMPHIBIE[2012/16]
Entry into regional phase13.12.2011National basic fee paid 
13.12.2011Search fee paid 
13.12.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/16]
28.10.2013Observations by third parties
04.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.01.2017
16.01.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
02.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination24.03.2017Appeal received No.  T1508/17
31.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
31.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.06.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
21.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
17.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]US4962978  (WESTON PAUL H [US]) [X] 1-4,6-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB265987  (ADOLF ROHRBACH) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1336634  (HENRY KLECKLER) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US3987982  (AMICK JAMES L) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - Icon Aircraft, "Icon Aircraft Successfully Completes Water Test for A5", (20090528), URL: http://www.troyleedesigns.com/news/icon-aircraft-successfully-completes-water-test-for-a5, (20130903), XP002712226 [X] 1-9,11 * the whole document * [I] 12-15
International search[Y]US4691881  (GIOIA G LEONARD [US]);
 [Y]US3987982  (AMICK JAMES L);
 [Y]US2008276851  (WEED JR RONALD T [US], et al);
 [A]US6547181  (HOISINGTON ZACHARY C [US], et al);
 [A]GB265987  (ADOLF ROHRBACH);
 [A]US4962978  (WESTON PAUL H [US])
by applicantUS4962978
 GB265987
 US1336634
 US3987982