Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2442709

EP2442709 - BODY-WORN PULSE OXIMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.04.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sotera Wireless, Inc.
10020 Huennekens Street
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2015/27]
Former [2012/17]For all designated states
Sotera Wireless, Inc.
9444 Waples Street, Suite 280
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MOON, Jim
4131 NW Thundercrest
Portland OR 97229-8028 / US
02 / MCCOMBIE, Devin
4030 Moratalla Terrace
San Diego CA 92130 / US
03 / DHILLON, Marshal
10402 Camino San Thomas
San Diego CA 92127 / US
04 / BANET, Matt
2125 Awihi Place
Kihei HI / US
 [2012/17]
Representative(s)Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Ganghoferstraße 68 B
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/17]Schiweck, Wolfram
Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch Landsberger Strasse 98
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date10790195.117.06.2010
WO2010US39000
Priority number, dateUS20090218057P17.06.2009         Original published format: US 218057 P
US2009055939214.09.2009         Original published format: US 559392
US20090218059P17.06.2009         Original published format: US 218059 P
US20090218061P17.06.2009         Original published format: US 218061 P
US20090218060P17.06.2009         Original published format: US 218060 P
US2009055941314.09.2009         Original published format: US 559413
US20090218062P17.06.2009         Original published format: US 218062 P
US2009055940814.09.2009         Original published format: US 559408
US2009055940314.09.2009         Original published format: US 559403
US2009055938614.09.2009         Original published format: US 559386
US2009055937914.09.2009         Original published format: US 559379
US20090218055P17.06.2009         Original published format: US 218055 P
[2012/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010148205
Date:23.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2442709
Date:25.04.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010
[2012/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.12.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/022, A61B5/0245, A61B5/1455, A61B5/00, // A61B5/021, A61B5/0452, A61B5/11
[2014/51]
Former International [2012/17]A61B5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/17]
TitleGerman:AM KÖRPER GETRAGENES PULSOXIMETER[2012/17]
English:BODY-WORN PULSE OXIMETER[2012/17]
French:SPHYGMO-OXYMÈTRE PORTÉ SUR LE CORPS[2012/17]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2012National basic fee paid 
17.01.2012Search fee paid 
17.01.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/17]
15.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
26.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
25.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007276270  (TRAN BAO [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0015] - [0026] - [0035] , [0055] - [0066] - [0086] , [0200] , [0204] , [0216] , [0244] , [0247] , [0260] , [0276] , [0282] * * paragraphs [0314] , [0323] - [0348] - [0354] , [0365] - [0373] - [0435] - [0453] - [0466]; figure - *;
 [X]US2005228298  (BANET MATTHEW J [US] ET AL) [X] 1,13,14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0032] - [0036] , [0039] , [0044]; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]US2007142730  (LAERMER FRANZ [DE] ET AL) [X] 2-4 * paragraphs [0014] - [0019] - [0026] - [0031]; figure -; claim - *;
 [XI]US2007142715  (BANET MATTHEW J [US] ET AL) [X] 2-4,6 * the whole document * [I] 7-12;
 [XI]US2008051667  (GOLDREICH RAMI [US]) [X] 7-10 * paragraphs [0051] - [0055] - [0111] , [0115] , [0130] - [0157]; figure -; claim - * [I] 1,3,4;
 [X]US2007185393  (ZHOU ZHOU [US] ET AL) [X] 7,10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0027] - [0040]; figure -; claim - *;
 [XI]US2007118028  (KITAJIMA KAZUMI [JP] ET AL) [X] 13,14 * paragraphs [0040] , [0043] , [0051] - [0093] - [0114] - [0119] * [I] 1,2,7-12;
 [XI]WO2007100959  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; MORONEY RICHARD M III [US]; NIELS) [X] 13,14 * page 4 - page 13; figure - * [I] 1,7-12;
 [XI]DE19832361  (NOEHTE STEFFEN [DE]; UNIV MANNHEIM [DE]) [X] 13,14 * the whole document * [I] 1
International search[Y]US2004034293  (KIMBALL VICTOR E [US]);
 [Y]WO2006005169  (TELEMEDIC INC [CA], et al);
 [Y]US2004225207  (BAE SANG-KON [KR], et al);
 [Y]US2009018453  (BANET MATTHEW J [US], et al);
 [Y]US2002170193  (TOWNSEND CHRISTOPHER P [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007071643  (HALL CHRISTOPHER [US], et al);
 [A]US2007129769  (BOURGET DUANE [US], et al);
 [A]US2008039731  (MCCOMBIE DEVIN B [US], et al);
 [A]US6198394  (JACOBSEN STEPHEN C [US], et al)
by applicantUS2007276270
 US2005228298
 US2007142730
 US2007142715
 US2008051667
 US2007185393
 US2007118028
 WO2007100959
 DE19832361
 US20090469182
 US20090469094
 US20080138194