Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2491048

EP2491048 - NOVEL MIL-53-AL-N3 ORGANIC/INORGANIC HYBRID SOLID PROVIDED WITH AN AZIDE FUNCTION, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2016
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IFP Energies nouvelles
1 & 4, Avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR
For all designated states
CNRS
3 Rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/44]For all designated states
IFP Énergies nouvelles
1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR
For all designated states
CNRS
3 Rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
Former [2012/35]For all designated states
IFP Energies nouvelles
1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR
For all designated states
CNRS
3 Rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
For all designated states
Universite Claude Bernard Lyon 1
43 boulevard du 11 novembre 1918
69622 Villeurbanne Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / SAVONNET, Marie
70 rue du Charolais
F-75012 Paris / FR
02 / FARRUSSENG, David
136H, rue Guillaume de Varey
Lotissement
Clos des Collonges
F-69380 Belmont D'azegues / FR
03 / PINEL, Catherine
77 rue Pasteur
F-69007 Lyon / FR
04 / BAZER-BACHI, Delphine
0006 All Raoul Follereau
F-69230 St-Genis-Laval / FR
05 / BATS, Nicolas
0006 Imp Giuseppe Verdi
F-69320 Feyzin / FR
06 / LECOCQ, Vincent
0004 rue des Chapeliers
F-69530 Brignais / FR
 [2013/10]
Former [2012/35]01 / SAVONNET, Marie
0009 rue de l'Arbre Sec
F-69001 Lyon / FR
02 / FARRUSSENG, David
136H, rue Guillaume de Varey
Lotissement
Clos des Collonges
F-69380 Belmont D'azegues / FR
03 / PINEL, Catherine
77 rue Pasteur
F-69007 Lyon / FR
04 / BAZER-BACHI, Delphine
0006 All Raoul Follereau
F-69230 St-Genis-Laval / FR
05 / BATS, Nicolas
0006 Imp Giuseppe Verdi
F-69320 Feyzin / FR
06 / LECOCQ, Vincent
0004 rue des Chapeliers
F-69530 Brignais / FR
Representative(s)Guillat-Terpend, Michèle , et al
IFP Energies nouvelles 1 et 4 avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR
[2012/35]
Application number, filing date10790580.406.10.2010
[2015/52]
WO2010FR00667
Priority number, dateFR2009000510523.10.2009         Original published format: FR 0905105
[2012/35]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011048280
Date:28.04.2011
Language:FR
[2011/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2491048
Date:29.08.2012
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011
[2012/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2491048
Date:23.12.2015
Language:FR
[2015/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07F5/06
[2012/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUER ORGANISCHER/ANORGANISCHER MIL-53-AL-N3-HYBRIDFESTSTOFF MIT EINER AZIDFUNKTION SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2012/35]
English:NOVEL MIL-53-AL-N3 ORGANIC/INORGANIC HYBRID SOLID PROVIDED WITH AN AZIDE FUNCTION, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME[2012/35]
French:NOUVEAU SOLIDE HYBRIDE ORGANIQUE-INORGANIQUE MIL-53-AL-N3 POURVU D'UNE FONCTION AZOTURE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRÉPARATION[2012/35]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2012National basic fee paid 
23.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/35]
21.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.07.2015Fee for grant paid
08.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2015
Opposition(s)26.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.10.2010
AL23.12.2015
AT23.12.2015
BG23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
MT23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
RS23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
TR23.12.2015
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU06.10.2010
AT23.12.2015
BG23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
MT23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
RS23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
TR23.12.2015
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
Former [2018/32]HU06.10.2010
AT23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
MT23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
RS23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
TR23.12.2015
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
Former [2018/29]HU06.10.2010
AT23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
RS23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
TR23.12.2015
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
Former [2018/28]HU06.10.2010
AT23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
RS23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
Former [2017/15]AT23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
RS23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
Former [2016/38]AT23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
RS23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
Former [2016/36]AT23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
RS23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
RS23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
RS23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
RS23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
RS23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
Former [2016/20]LT23.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[T]  - SAVONNET, M. ET AL., "Generic Postfunctionalization Route from Amino-Derived Metal-Organic Frameworks", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20100407), vol. 132, no. 13, pages 4518 - 4519, XP002584326 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA909613E
 [AD]  - WANG, Z. ET AL., "Accessing postsynthetic modification in a series of metal-organic frameworks and the influence of framework topology on reactivity", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 48, pages 296 - 306, XP002584327 [AD] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic801837t
 [AD]  - AHNFELDT, T. ET AL., "Synthesis and modification of a functionalized 3D open-framework structure with MIL-53 topology", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20090406), vol. 48, pages 3057 - 3064, XP002584359 [AD] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic8023265
by applicant   - FRANZ T.J, J INVEST DEMATOL, (1975), vol. 64, pages 190 - 195,