Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2519682

EP2519682 - A LAUNDRY DRYER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.10.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
29.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arçelik Anonim Sirketi
Sutluce Karaagac Caddesi No: 2/6
Beyoglu
34445 Istanbul / TR
[2019/27]
Former [2012/45]For all designated states
Arçelik Anonim Sirketi
E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla
34950 Istanbul / TR
Inventor(s)01 / GULBAY, Umit
E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri
Tuzla
34950 Istanbul / TR
02 / CINAR, Levent
E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri
Tuzla
34950 Istanbul / TR
03 / CAN, Remzi
E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri
Tuzla
34950 Istanbul / TR
 [2012/45]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date10790991.316.12.2010
WO2010EP69998
Priority number, dateTR2009001008331.12.2009         Original published format: TR 200910083
[2012/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011080114
Date:07.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2519682
Date:07.11.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011
[2012/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2519682
Date:06.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:D06F58/04
[2012/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WÄSCHETROCKNER[2012/45]
English:A LAUNDRY DRYER[2012/45]
French:SÈCHE-LINGE[2012/45]
Entry into regional phase28.06.2012National basic fee paid 
28.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/45]
08.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2013Fee for grant paid
27.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.07.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.07.2014  06.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A.
Via Carlo Pisacane 1
20016 Pero (MI) / IT
Opponent's representative
Spina, Alessandro
Whirlpool EMEA SpA
Via Carlo Pisacane, 1
20016 Pero (MI) / IT
 02  05.08.2014  08.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Whirlpool Europe Srl
Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
Opponent's representative
Guerci, Alessandro, et al
Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A.
Patent Department
Via Aldo Moro 5
21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) / IT
 03  06.08.2014  12.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Electrolux Appliances Aktiebolag
St Göransgatan 143
105 45 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Mollekopf, Gerd Willi
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
 [2018/29]
Former [2018/08]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2014  06.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 47
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Opponent's representative
Guerci, Alessandro
Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A.
Patent Department
Via Aldo Moro 5
21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) / IT
 02  05.08.2014  08.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Whirlpool Europe Srl
Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
Opponent's representative
Guerci, Alessandro, et al
Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A.
Patent Department
Via Aldo Moro 5
21024 Biandronno - Frazione Cassinetta (VA) / IT
 03  06.08.2014  12.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Electrolux Appliances Aktiebolag
St Göransgatan 143
105 45 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Mollekopf, Gerd Willi
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
Former [2016/51]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2014  06.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 47
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Opponent's representative
Guerci, Alessandro
Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
 02  05.08.2014  08.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Whirlpool Europe Srl
Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
Opponent's representative
Guerci, Alessandro, et al
Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
 03  06.08.2014  12.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Electrolux Appliances Aktiebolag
St Göransgatan 143
105 45 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Mollekopf, Gerd Willi
Kahler Käck Mollekopf
Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg / DE
Former [2014/37]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2014  06.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 47
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Opponent's representative
Santonicola, Paolo
Indesit Company S.p.A. Industrial Property Management Team Via Lamberto Corsi, 55
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
 02  05.08.2014   
Whirlpool Europe Srl
Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
Opponent's representative
Guerci, Alessandro, et al
Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
 03  06.08.2014   
Electrolux Appliances Aktiebolag
St Göransgatan 143
105 45 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Mollekopf, Gerd Willi
Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239
86899 Landsberg a. Lech / DE
Former [2014/36]
Opponent(s)01  29.07.2014   
Indesit Company S.p.A.
Viale Aristide Merloni, 47
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
Opponent's representative
Santonicola, Paolo
Indesit Company S.p.A. Industrial Property Management Team Via Lamberto Corsi, 55
60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT
10.09.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
11.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.04.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1453/16
22.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
15.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.12.2010
AL06.11.2013
AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MK06.11.2013
MT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
IE16.12.2013
LU16.12.2013
NO06.02.2014
GR07.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2016/28]HU16.12.2010
AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MK06.11.2013
MT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
IE16.12.2013
LU16.12.2013
NO06.02.2014
GR07.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/47]HU16.12.2010
AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
GR06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MK06.11.2013
MT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
IE16.12.2013
LU16.12.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/41]HU16.12.2010
AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
GR06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MK06.11.2013
MT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
IE16.12.2013
LU16.12.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2015/38]HU16.12.2010
AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
GR06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MK06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
IE16.12.2013
LU16.12.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2015/34]HU16.12.2010
AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
BG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MK06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
IE16.12.2013
LU16.12.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2015/33]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
MK06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
IE16.12.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2015/30]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
IE16.12.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2015/25]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
SM06.11.2013
IE16.12.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2015/21]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IE16.12.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2015/14]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IE16.12.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IE16.12.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/41]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/37]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
PL06.11.2013
RO06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/36]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/28]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/26]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/25]AT06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
RS06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI06.11.2013
HR06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
Former [2014/20]LT06.11.2013
NO06.02.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2006104327  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-5 * figure 1; claim 1 *
by applicantUS2008189974
 US2008189973
Opposition   - "Test Wäschetrockner- Teure Heissluft", Stiftung Warentest- Test, (19980900), no. 9, pages 42 - 45, XP055304122