Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2416598

EP2416598 - METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR DEDUCING KEYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.07.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2012/06]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Aiqin
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
B1-3A, Bantian
Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN
02 / CHEN, Jing
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
B1-3A, Bantian
Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN
03 / BI, Xiaoyu
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Intellectual Property Department
B1-3A, Bantian
Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN
 [2012/06]
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[2014/43]
Former [2012/06]Kreuz, Georg Maria
Huawei Technologies Riesstrasse 25
80992 München / DE
Application number, filing date10791589.426.06.2010
WO2010CN74559
Priority number, dateCN20091014842326.06.2009         Original published format: CN200910148423
[2012/06]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010149083
Date:29.12.2010
Language:ZH
[2010/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2416598
Date:08.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2416598
Date:28.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN29.12.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04W12/04
[2012/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR SCHLÜSSELABLEITUNG[2012/06]
English:METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR DEDUCING KEYS[2012/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME POUR DÉDUIRE DES CLÉS[2012/06]
Entry into regional phase01.11.2011Translation filed 
01.11.2011National basic fee paid 
01.11.2011Search fee paid 
01.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
01.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/06]
02.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2013Fee for grant paid
10.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13178106.4  / EP2658300
EP19189968.1
EP19189974.9
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.04.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.05.2014  06.07.2016  WITHDRAWN
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Sinn, Vincent
Ericsson GmbH
Patent Department
Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
 [2016/33]
Former [2014/29]
Opponent(s)01  28.05.2014  06.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Sinn, Vincent
Ericsson GmbH
Patent Department
Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
04.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
21.01.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition09.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0593/16
31.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
21.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0593/16
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.08.2013
BE28.08.2013
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MK28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
TR28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE26.06.2014
LU26.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]BE28.08.2013
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MK28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
TR28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE26.06.2014
LU26.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2016/33]BE28.08.2013
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
TR28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE26.06.2014
LU26.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2016/28]BE28.08.2013
BG28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE26.06.2014
LU26.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2016/22]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
SM28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE26.06.2014
LU26.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2016/16]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
MT28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE26.06.2014
LU26.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/21]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
IE26.06.2014
LU26.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/20]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
LU26.06.2014
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/09]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
MC28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
LU26.06.2014
Former [2014/23]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
CZ28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
EE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
SK28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/22]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
RO28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/21]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
DK28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/18]BE28.08.2013
CY28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/14]CY07.08.2013
BE28.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY07.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
LV28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
SI28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
GR29.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY07.08.2013
FI28.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
PL28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY07.08.2013
HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
IS28.12.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/09]HR28.08.2013
LT28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT28.08.2013
NO28.11.2013
PT30.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO28.11.2013
Documents cited:Search[I]CN101304311  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 EP2293609  [ ] (ZTE CORP [CN]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 2, 3 *;
 [I]  - 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT;TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION GROUP SERVICES AND SYSTEM ASPECTS, "3GPP TS 33.401 V8.4.0: 3GPP System Architecture Evolution (SAE): Security architecture (Release 8)", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT, (20090604), XP050347373 [I] 1-15 * section 7.2.4 Security mode command procedure and algorithm negotiation * * section 7.2.8 Key handling in handover * * section 9 Security interworking between E-UTRAN and UTRAN *
 [A]  - NOKIA CORPORATION ET AL, "Key freshness during mobility from E-UTRAN to UTRAN/GERAN", CHANGE REQUEST S3-080838; 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), (20080627), XP050280965 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [AP]  - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "Key freshness at E-UTRAN to UTRAN handover", CHANGE REQUEST S3-091477; 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), (20090709), XP050356613 [AP] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [AP]  - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "Ensuring key freshness at handover from E-UTRAN to UTRAN/GERAN (Rel-9)", CONTRIBUTION S3-091729; 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), (20090928), XP050398229 [AP] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]CN101355507  (ZTE CORP [CN]);
 [A]CN101304311  (ZTE CORP [CN]);
 [A]CN101232731  (ZTE CORP [CN]);
 [A]CN101232736  (ZTE CORP [CN])