Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2496649

EP2496649 - FILM-FORMING COMPOSITION CONTAINING AN AGENT CAPABLE OF TRAPPING FORMALDEHYDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.02.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
20.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saint-Gobain Adfors
517, Avenue de la Boisse
73000 Chambéry / FR
[2012/37]
Inventor(s)01 / BLANCHARD, Benjamin
17 rue Auguste Méry
F-95150 Taverny / FR
02 / CHUDA, Katarzyna
3 rue Marguerite Chapon
94800 Villejuifuif / FR
 [2012/37]
Representative(s)Saint-Gobain Recherche
Département Propriété Industrielle
39 Quai Lucien Lefranc
93300 Aubervilliers / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]Jamet, Vincent
Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc
93300 Aubervilliers / FR
Application number, filing date10792960.603.11.2010
WO2010FR52352
Priority number, dateFR2009000527203.11.2009         Original published format: FR 0905272
[2012/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011055073
Date:12.05.2011
Language:FR
[2011/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2496649
Date:12.09.2012
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011
[2012/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2496649
Date:19.03.2014
Language:FR
[2014/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:C09D5/02, C09D7/12
[2012/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/37]
Extension statesBA04.06.2012
ME04.06.2012
TitleGerman:FILMBILDENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM STOFF ZUM EINFANGEN VON FORMALDEHYD[2012/37]
English:FILM-FORMING COMPOSITION CONTAINING AN AGENT CAPABLE OF TRAPPING FORMALDEHYDE[2012/37]
French:COMPOSITION FILMOGENE RENFERMANT UN AGENT APTE A PIEGER LE FORMALDEHYDE[2012/37]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2012National basic fee paid 
04.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/37]
03.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2014Fee for grant paid
31.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.04.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.12.2014  09.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Coatings GmbH
Glasuritstrasse 1
48165 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 40 09
40031 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/08]
Opponent(s)01  19.12.2014  09.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Coatings GmbH
Glasuritstrasse 1
48165 Münster / DE
Opponent's representative
Leifert & Steffan
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09
40031 Düsseldorf / DE
27.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
04.08.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.08.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition04.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2274/16
13.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
30.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.11.2010
AL19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
TR19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU03.11.2010
CY19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
TR19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/33]HU03.11.2010
CY19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
TR19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/32]HU03.11.2010
CY19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
TR19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/28]CY19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/22]CY19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/46]CY19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE03.11.2014
LU03.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/36]CY19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
LU03.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/33]CY19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
LU03.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]CY19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
LU03.11.2014
Former [2015/30]CY19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
LU03.11.2014
Former [2015/08]CY19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/02]CY19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2014/50]CY19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/49]CY19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/48]CY19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY19.03.2014
FI19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
SE19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]FR1483515  (FORD WERKE AG) [X] 1-9,12 * claim - *;
 [X]US5969046  (SCHINDLER F J [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12 * example 5; claim - *;
 [X]JP2000144016  ;
 [X]JP2001089217
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 36, Database accession no. 2000-415911, XP002590107 & JP2000144016 A 20000526 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD) [X] 1-9,12-14 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 50, Database accession no. 2001-459717, XP002590109 & JP2001089217 A 20010403 (ONODA KK) [X] 1-14 * abstract *
by applicantCN1912037
 CN1290948C
 CN1303168C
 US2005226761
 EP1437397
 US2004101695
 JP2004115340
 JP2000095980
 JP2005230729
 CN101016426