EP2451093 - OPTICAL TRANSMISSION DEVICE AND OPTICAL TRANSMISSION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAWADA, Kazushige c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
SUGIHARA, Takashi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
SHIMAKURA, Yasuhisa c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
SUGIHARA, Kohei c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | 01 /
SAWADA, Kazushige c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
SUGIHARA, Takashi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIMAKURA, Yasuhisa c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
04 /
SUGIHARA, Kohei c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10793885.4 | 08.03.2010 | WO2010JP53804 | Priority number, date | JP20090156841 | 01.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009156841 | [2012/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011001714 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2451093 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/03, H04B10/50 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
H04B10/516 (EP,US);
H04B10/5051 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | H04B10/04, G02F1/03, H04B10/02, H04B10/06, H04B10/14, H04B10/142, H04B10/152, H04B10/18, H04B10/26, H04B10/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTISCHEN ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2012/19] | English: | OPTICAL TRANSMISSION DEVICE AND OPTICAL TRANSMISSION METHOD | [2012/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉMISSION OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION OPTIQUE | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2012 | Translation filed | 12.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 06.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/14] | 13.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005046843 (DOERR CHRISTOPHER R [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0025] * * figure 1 * [Y] 2,5-7; | [Y]EP1793513 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1335242 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 5-7 * figure 17 * | International search | [X]JP2009027517 (NTT ELECTRONICS CORP); | [Y]JP2007158415 (FUJITSU LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2003233047 (FUJITSU LTD) | by applicant | JP2007158415 |