EP2450960 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENTS, DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENTS, AND PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takedatobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUSHIMA, Norihiko c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION Shiga Yohkaichi Plant 1166-6 Hebimizo-cho Higashiomi-shi Shiga 527-8555 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMURA, Daisuke c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION Shiga Yohkaichi Plant 1166-6 Hebimizo-cho Higashiomi-shi Shiga 527-8555 / JP | 03 /
HATATE, Atsuo c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION Shiga Yohkaichi Plant 1166-6 Hebimizo-cho Higashiomi-shi Shiga 527-8555 / JP | 04 /
OHKUMA, Takeshi c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION Shiga Yohkaichi Plant 1166-6 Hebimizo-cho Higashiomi-shi Shiga 527-8555 / JP | 05 /
ARIMUNE, Hisao c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION Shiga Yohkaichi Plant 1166-6 Hebimizo-cho Higashiomi-shi Shiga 527-8555 / JP | 06 /
HASHIMOTO, Yukari c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION Shiga Yohkaichi Plant 1166-6 Hebimizo-cho Higashiomi-shi Shiga 527-8555 / JP | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Phoenixbau Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10794131.2 | 29.06.2010 | WO2010JP61030 | Priority number, date | JP20090154340 | 29.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009154340 | [2012/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011001962 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2450960 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/04 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
H01L31/1868 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5313 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG FOTOELEKTRISCHER UMWANDLUNGSELEMENTE, VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG FOTOELEKTRISCHER UMWANDLUNGSELEMENTE UND FOTOELEKTRISCHES UMWANDLUNGSELEMENT | [2012/19] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENTS, DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENTS, AND PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENT | [2012/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENTS DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE, ÉLÉMENTS DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE, DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENTS DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2011 | Translation filed | 14.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 16.09.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5986270 (HANDOTAI ENERGY KENKYUSHO); | [X]JPS6418274U (FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD.); | [X]JPH09266322 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2003513473 (PACIFIC SOLAR PTY, LTD.); | [Y]JP2004115356 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2005159167 (KYOCERA CORP) | by applicant | JPH09266322 |