Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2449305

EP2449305 - DIFFUSE REFLECTIVE ILLUMINATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OMRON Corporation
801, Minamifudodo-cho
Horikawahigashiiru
Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
[2019/37]
Former [2012/19]For all designated states
Microscan Systems, Inc.
700 SW 39th Street
Renton, WA 98057 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MESSINA, Michael, C.
205 Hackett Hill
Hooksett, NH 03106 / US
 [2012/19]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2019/39]
Former [2012/19]MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date10794557.822.06.2010
[2019/39]
WO2010US39536
Priority number, dateUS2009049726502.07.2009         Original published format: US 497265
[2012/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011002636
Date:06.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2449305
Date:09.05.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011
[2012/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2449305
Date:25.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR31.03.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2014
ClassificationInternational:F21V7/04, F21V7/00, F21V7/22, F21Y115/10
[2019/03]
Former International [2012/19]F21V7/04, F21Y101/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIFFUS REFLEKTIERENDER BELEUCHTER[2012/19]
English:DIFFUSE REFLECTIVE ILLUMINATOR[2012/19]
French:ECLAIRAGE PAR RÉFLEXION DIFFUSE[2012/19]
Entry into regional phase02.02.2012National basic fee paid 
02.02.2012Search fee paid 
02.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/19]
31.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.2019Fee for grant paid
17.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
11.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]US2007263379  (DOWLING KEVIN J [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8-12,17-21 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0077]; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]JP2001243821  (MITSUBISHI ELEC LIGHTING CORP) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-9 *;
 [X]JP2007234342  (CCS INC) [X] 1-6,8,9,13 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-8 *;
 [Y]GB2437544  (HOLLOWAY GARY M [GB]) [Y] 13-16 * page 1, line 2 - page 16, line 19; figures 1-14 *;
 [Y]WO2008042324  (SIEMENS ENERGY & AUTOMAT [US], et al) [Y] 13-16 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0189]; figures 1-8 *
International search[A]US2008158854  (MATSUI HIDEKI [JP]);
 [A]US2005030960  (SUMIDA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al);
 [A]WO9940361  (STUDIO DUE LIGHT DIVISION S R [IT], et al);
 [A]US2004001344  (HECHT KURT [US])