Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2512436

EP2512436 - CONDITIONING COMPOSITION FOR HAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2016
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kao Germany GmbH
Pfungstädter Strasse 92-100
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2012/43]
Inventor(s)01 / MOLENDA, Michael
Herrmannstr. 27
60318 Frankfurt / DE
02 / TIETJEN, Ilka
Hauptstr. 42
68549 Ilvesheim / DE
03 / GRIT, Mustafa
Taunusstr. 4
64579 Gernsheim / DE
 [2012/43]
Representative(s)Grit, Mustafa
Kao Germany GmbH
Pfungstädterstrasse 92-100
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2012/43]
Application number, filing date10795245.915.12.2010
WO2010EP07679
Priority number, dateEP2009001567718.12.2009         Original published format: EP 09015677
[2012/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011072854
Date:23.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2512436
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011
[2012/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/898, A61Q5/02, A61Q5/12
[2012/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/43]
TitleGerman:KONDITIONIERZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR HAARE[2012/43]
English:CONDITIONING COMPOSITION FOR HAIR[2012/43]
French:COMPOSITION DE SOIN CAPILLAIRE[2012/43]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2012National basic fee paid 
30.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/43]
28.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2016Observations by third parties
05.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
09.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
09.01.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination12.02.2018Appeal received No.  T1545/18
18.05.2018Statement of grounds filed
18.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.03.2014
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
05.01.2015Request for further processing filed
05.01.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.01.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
28.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2004066972  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * claims 1,28,32 * * page 1, lines 16-22 * * pages 5-6 * * page 13, line 23 - page 15, line 5 * [Y] 2-13;
 [XY]EP2022478  (KPSS KAO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-15 * claim 1 * * page 2, paragraphs 5-6 * [Y] 2;
 [XY]WO2004010967  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1,14,15 * claims 1,10,14,15 * * page 3, lines 3-4 * * page 3, lines 8-25 * * pages 17,18 * [Y] 2-13;
 [XY]WO2004032887  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,14,15 * pages 18-19; example 10 * * page 20; compound 11 * * page 21, lines 1-2; compound 21 * [Y] 4-13;
 [XY]US2009255063  (MARQUAIS-BIENEWALD SOPHIE [FR], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 20; example B67 * [Y] 4-13;
 [Y]JPH01203314  (SHISEIDO CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *
 [Y]  - HERRWERT S ET AL, "Silicone Quaternium-22: New silicone technology for premium hair conditioning with additional benefits", SOFW-JOURNAL SEIFEN, OELE, FETTE, WACHSE, VERLAG FUR CHEMISCHE INDUSTRIE, AUGSBURG, DE, (20090601), vol. 135, no. 6, ISSN 0942-7694, pages 11 - 12,14, XP002584466 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GOTTSCHALCK T E ET AL, INTERNATIONAL COSMETIC INGREDIENT DICTIONARY AND HANDBOOK, passage, INTERNATIONAL COSMETIC INGREDIENT DICTIONARY AND HANDBOOK, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 2148 - 2152, (20060101), XP002470374 [A] 1,3-15 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - JURCZYK MATTHEW F ET AL, CATIONIC SURFACTANTS AND QUATERNARY DERIVATIVES FOR HAIR AND SKIN CARE, COSMETIC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY SERIES, DEKKER, NEW YORK, NY, US, PAGE(S) 223 - 249, (19990101), ISSN 0887-6541, XP001249398 [X] 1,14,15 * pages 242-243 * [Y] 2-13
by applicantEP1887024
 DE2521960
 DE2811010
 DE3044738
 DE3217059
 EP0337354
 EP0070074
 EP0358216