Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2648872

EP2648872 - DEVICE FOR STRUCTURING LARGE FORMAT MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.02.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schneeberger AG Lineartechnik
St. Urbanstrasse 12
4914 Roggwil / CH
[2015/14]
Former [2013/42]For all designated states
Solneva SA
Alte Lyssstrasse 2
3270 Aarberg / CH
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNEEBERGER, Stefan
Les Rochettes
CH-1595 Faoug / CH
02 / FREI, Bruno
Mühlestrasse 23
CH-3634 Thierachern / CH
 [2013/42]
Representative(s)Egli, Richard A. , et al
Egli Patentanwälte Horneggstrasse 4 Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/42]Scheuzger, Beat Otto
Bovard AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16
3000 Bern 25 / CH
Application number, filing date10795293.910.12.2010
WO2010EP69390
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012076064
Date:14.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2648872
Date:16.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2012
[2013/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:B23K26/00, B23K26/08
[2013/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/42]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR STRUKTURIERUNG VON GROSSFORMATIGEN MODULEN[2013/42]
English:DEVICE FOR STRUCTURING LARGE FORMAT MODULES[2013/42]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR STRUCTURER DES MODULES DE GRAND FORMAT[2013/42]
Entry into regional phase30.05.2013National basic fee paid 
30.05.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
30.05.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/42]
07.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
10.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
08.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
20.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
10.07.201303   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP2139049  (SCHNEEBERGER HOLDING AG [CH]) [Y] 1-4,8-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2008185365  (YANG YUNG-HUI [TW], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0012] , [0013] *;
 [Y]WO2010093049  (NISSHINBO HOLDINGS INC [JP], et al) [Y] 5-7 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1880790  (MANZ AUTOMATION AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0011] *
by applicantEP2139049