Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2513156

EP2513156 - METHOD FOR REPLACING INCOMPATIBLE ETHYLENE POLYMERIZATION CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.02.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOTAL RESEARCH & TECHNOLOGY FELUY
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
[2012/43]
Inventor(s)01 / DEWACHTER, Daan
Schansveld 12
B-2800 Mechelen / BE
02 / SLAWINSKI, Martine
Allée des Couterelles 7
B-1400 Nivelles / BE
 [2012/43]
Representative(s)Bounaga, Sakina , et al
De Clercq & Partners
Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2012/43]Bounaga, Sakina , et al
De Clercq & Partners cvba Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
Application number, filing date10795345.717.12.2010
WO2010EP70027
Priority number, dateEP2009017987018.12.2009         Original published format: EP 09179870
[2012/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011073369
Date:23.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2513156
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011
[2012/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2513156
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/42, C08F10/02
[2012/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Austauschen von nicht kompatiblen Ethylenpolymerisierungskatalysatoren[2013/43]
English:METHOD FOR REPLACING INCOMPATIBLE ETHYLENE POLYMERIZATION CATALYSTS[2012/43]
French:Procédé de remplacement des catalyseurs de polymérisation d'éthylène incompatibles[2013/43]
Former [2012/43]VERFAHREN FÜR DEN ERSATZVON NICHT KOMPATIBLEN ETHYLENPOLYMERISATIONSKATALYSATOREN
Former [2012/43]PROCÉDÉ DE REMPLACEMENT DE CATALYSEURS DE POLYMÉRISATION D'ÉTHYLÈNE INCOMPATIBLES
Entry into regional phase05.07.2012National basic fee paid 
05.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/43]
08.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2014Fee for grant paid
05.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.10.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.12.2014   
INEOS Europe AG
Avenue des Uttins 3
Rolle
CH-1180 Vaud / CH
Opponent's representative
King, Alex
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB
 [2015/07]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
28.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.08.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
23.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.02.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition21.04.2017Appeal received No.  T1020/17
23.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
28.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.12.2010
AL19.03.2014
AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU17.12.2010
AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MK19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/33]HU17.12.2010
AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
MT19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/32]HU17.12.2010
AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/28]AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
GR20.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/27]AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
MC19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/22]AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
SM19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/47]AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/46]AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
Former [2015/36]AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SI19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
LU17.12.2014
Former [2015/35]AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
LU17.12.2014
Former [2015/08]AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
DK19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
PT21.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT19.03.2014
CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/50]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
PL19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
SK19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/49]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RO19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
IS19.07.2014
Former [2014/48]CY19.03.2014
CZ19.03.2014
EE19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
BG19.06.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY19.03.2014
HR19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
LV19.03.2014
RS19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY19.03.2014
LT19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT19.03.2014
NO19.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9732905  (BOREALIS AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO2006069204  (UNIVATION TECH LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * claims 1,6-8 *;
 [Y]WO2005077522  (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE], et al) [Y] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1553108  (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [A] 1-17 * claims 1,11 *;
 [A]WO2004060938  (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * claim - *
by applicantUS2009143546
    - Encyclopaedia of Chemical Technology, vol. 16, page 390