Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2513160

EP2513160 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING ETHYLENE POLYMERIZATION REACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.04.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
30.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOTAL RESEARCH & TECHNOLOGY FELUY
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
[2012/43]
Inventor(s)01 / SIRAUX, Daniel
Rue des Prés Mercq 18
B-7062 Naast / BE
 [2012/43]
Representative(s)Hennin, Caroline Marie Odile , et al
De Clercq & Partners
Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2012/43]Bounaga, Sakina , et al
De Clercq & Partners cvba Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
Application number, filing date10795346.517.12.2010
WO2010EP70031
Priority number, dateEP2009017982418.12.2009         Original published format: EP 09179824
[2012/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011073372
Date:23.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2513160
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011
[2012/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2513160
Date:12.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:C08F10/02, C08F110/02
[2013/38]
Former International [2012/43]C08F10/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM VERBESSERN DER ETHYLENPOLYMERISIERUNGSREAKTION[2013/42]
English:METHOD FOR IMPROVING ETHYLENE POLYMERIZATION REACTION[2012/43]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE RÉACTION DE POLYMÉRISATION D'ÉTHYLÈNE[2013/42]
Former [2012/43]VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG VON ETHYLENPOLYMERISATIONSREAKTIONEN
Former [2012/43]PROCEDE D'AMELIORATION DE LA REACTION DE POLYMERISATION D'ETHYLENE
Entry into regional phase05.07.2012National basic fee paid 
05.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/43]
25.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2014Fee for grant paid
27.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.09.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.12.2014  18.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Europe AG
Avenue des Uttins 3
1180 Rolle, Vaud / CH
Opponent's representative
King, Alex, et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB
 [2015/04]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
19.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.07.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
21.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.04.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition20.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1447/17
31.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
27.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.12.2010
AL12.03.2014
AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
MK12.03.2014
MT12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
SM12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
GR13.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU17.12.2010
AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
MK12.03.2014
MT12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
SM12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
GR13.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/33]HU17.12.2010
AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
MT12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
SM12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
GR13.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/32]HU17.12.2010
AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
SM12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
GR13.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/28]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
SM12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
GR13.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/27]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
MC12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
SM12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/22]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
SM12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/47]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/46]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
IE17.12.2014
LU17.12.2014
Former [2015/36]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SI12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
LU17.12.2014
Former [2015/35]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
LU17.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
RS03.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
DK12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
PT14.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT12.03.2014
CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
Former [2014/50]CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
PL12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
SK12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
Former [2014/49]CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
RO12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
IS12.07.2014
Former [2014/48]CY12.03.2014
CZ12.03.2014
EE12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
BG12.06.2014
NO12.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY12.03.2014
HR12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
LV12.03.2014
RS12.03.2014
NO12.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY12.03.2014
LT12.03.2014
NO12.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT12.03.2014
NO12.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[I]EP1553108  (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [I] 1-10 * claims 12,13 * * page 2, paragraphs 1-3,9-11 * * page 3, paragraphs 14,18,19 *;
 [I]EP1842861  (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE]) [I] 1-10 * claims 1,7 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0015] *;
 [I]US2005272891  (FOUARGE LOUIS [BE] ET AL) [I] 1-10 * page 13, paragraph 170 - paragraph 176 * * claim 23 * * figures 1,3,4 * * page 1, paragraph 4 *;
 [I]WO2005077994  (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE]; DAMME ERIC [BE]) [I] 1-10 * claim 1 * * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 2, line 14 - line 22 * * page 5, line last line * * page 6, line 11 - line 16 *
by applicant   - Encyclopaedia of Chemical Technology, vol. 16, page 390