Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2506724

EP2506724 - VIGNA UNGUICULATA SEED EXTRACT AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.06.2016
Database last updated on 21.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2016New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Laboratoires Expanscience
10, Avenue de l'Arche
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2012/41]
Inventor(s)01 / MSIKA, Philippe
32 rue de la Paroisse
F-78000 Versailles / FR
02 / SAUNOIS, Alex
36 bis chemin du Boullay-Thierry
F-28210 Nogent-le-roi / FR
03 / LECLERE-BIENFAIT, Sophie
34A, rue Saint-Martin
F-28100 Dreux / FR
04 / BAUDOIN, Caroline
80 rue Madame de Maintenon
F-78120 Rambouillet / FR
 [2012/41]
Representative(s)Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[2012/49]
Former [2012/41]Ahner, Francis , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date10795960.330.11.2010
WO2010EP68573
Priority number, dateFR2009005852930.11.2009         Original published format: FR 0958529
[2012/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011064401
Date:03.06.2011
Language:FR
[2011/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2506724
Date:10.10.2012
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2011
[2012/41]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP29.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/29, A23L1/30, A61K8/97, A61Q5/00, A61Q19/00, A61K36/48, A61P17/00
[2012/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/41]
TitleGerman:VIGNA-UNGUICULATA-SAMENEXTRAKT UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT[2012/41]
English:VIGNA UNGUICULATA SEED EXTRACT AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE SAME[2012/41]
French:EXTRAIT DE GRAINES DE VIGNA UNGUICULATA ET COMPOSITIONS LE COMPRENANT[2012/41]
Entry into regional phase28.06.2012National basic fee paid 
28.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/41]
08.01.2013Observations by third parties
21.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.03.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
09.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
09.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Licence(s)deleted
[2012/41]
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0238946  (DANSKE SUKKERFAB [DK]) [X] 1-13 * claims 1,4 * * column 1, lines 28-38 *;
 [X]EP0985352  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [X] 1-13 * claims 1,8-12 * * column 3, paragraph 16 * * columns 6-7; examples 1,2 *;
 [X]US2004131749  (GRABIEL RICHARD D [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 1,9,11,35,41-55.58.59 * * page 4, paragraph 26 * * page 5, paragraphs 52,55 * * page 6, paragraph 66 *;
 [X]WO02055049  (COGNIS FRANCE SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 1,3,7-12 * * page 1 * * pages 6-7 *;
 [X]JP2002265324  (ICHIMARU PHARCOS INC) [X] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0532465  (PENTAPHARM AG [CH]) [Y] 1-17 * claims 1,3,4,6,7,9 * * page 3, line 5 * * page 4; examples 1,2 *;
 [Y]WO2005102259  (EXPANSCIENCE LAB [FR], et al) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO2005105123  (EXPANSCIENCE LAB [FR], et al) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2009149362  (KALIDINDI SANYASI RAJU [US]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [T]  - anonymous, "Kuhbohne, Augenbohne (Vigna unguiculata [L.] Walp. ssp. unguiculata [= V. sinensis [L.] Walp.])", (20070612), URL: http://geb.uni-giessen.de/geb/volltexte/2000/320/original/kuhbohne.htm, (20100705), XP002590470 [T] * the whole document *
 [X]  - GOMATHINAYAGAM P ET AL, "Seed protein pattern of cowpea (Vigna unguiculata L.) and its distant species", DATABASE Chemical Abstracts, Chemi, (19950522), URL: CHEMICAL, XP002137217 [X] 1-13 * abstract *
 [X]  - SAINI H S, "EXTRACTABILITY AND EVALUATION OF ALPHA-GALACTOSIDES OF SUCROSE IN LEGUMINOUS SEEDS", FOOD CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER LTD, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0308-8146(88)90144-6, (19880101), vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 0308-8146, pages 149 - 157, XP000986899 [X] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0308-8146(88)90144-6
 [A]  - UZOGARA S G ET AL, "PROCESSING AND UTILIZATION OF COWPEAS IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES: A REVIEW", JOURNAL OF FOOD PROCESSING AND PRESERVATION, TRUMBULL, CT, US, (19920101), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 105 - 147, XP000981465 [A] 1-17 * the whole document *
by applicant   WO2005115421 A1 20051208
    WO2005105123 A1 20051110
    WO2004012496 A2 20040212
    WO2004012752 A2 20040212
    WO2004016106 A1 20040226
    WO2007057439 A1 20070524
    WO0121605 A2 20010329
    WO0152837 A2 20010726
    WO0206205 A1 20020124
    WO0121150 A1 20010329
    FR2822821 A1 20021004
    FR2857596 A1 20050121
    WO2005102259 A1 20051103
    WO9847479 A1 19981029
    WO2004112742 A2 20041229
    WO2008009709 A1 20080124
    WO2004050052 A1 20040617
    WO2004050079 A1 20040617
    WO2004112741 A1 20041229
    WO2008080974 A1 20080710
    FR955343 A 19500114
    FR955344 A 19500114
    - BROWN, JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY B : BIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 63, pages 148 - 161,
other   - "Kulatthagunaah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RS/5411, XP003032285
    - Brhat Nighantu Ratnakara, (1997), vol. 4, page 629,
    - "Kulattha Gunah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RG9/687, XP003032286
    - SODHALA, Sodhalanighantauh, (1978), vol. 1, page 174,
    - "Shasrayukarana", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RG5/318, XP003032287
    - Rasarnavama, (2001), vol. 4, page 211,
    - "Saptavrddhi Cikitsa-3", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. VK1/596B, XP003032288
    - HASAVATAJA, Basavarajiyam-Chaukhambha, (2005), vol. 1, pages 236 - 237,
    - "Vrddha Talakesvararasa", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AK9/954, XP003032289
    - CADAMANI, Rasakamadhenu Samhita, (1992), vol. 4, pages 309 - 310,
    - "Sitapittapathyah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. SL/348, XP003032290
    - Yogaratnakarah, (2004), vol. 8, page 237,
    - "Bhrngarajatailam", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RD/648, XP003032291
    - Bharata Bhaisajya Ratnakara, (199908), vol. 2, page 649,
    - "Dvitiyakulittha Gudah", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. AK11/1042, XP003032292
    - VANGASENA, Vangasena, (1996), page 260,
    - "Medorog Cikitsa", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RS2/1353B, XP003032293
    - SODHALA, Gadanigrahah, (1999), vol. 3, page 681,
    - "Pirandai Vadagam", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. SR06/183, XP003032294
    - THERAYAR, Therayar Kappiyam, (1975), vol. 1, pages 54 - 55,