Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2445751

EP2445751 - PERFORMANCE AND POSITION MONITORING OF A MOBILE HVAC&R UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.08.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2018New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carrier Corporation
One Carrier Place
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[2012/18]
Inventor(s)01 / LIFSON, Alexander
8198 Dycus Circle
Manlius NY 13104 / US
02 / TARAS, Michael, F.
5424 Springview Drive
Fayetteville NY 13066 / US
 [2012/18]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/36]Taylor, Adam David
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2012/18]Taylor, Adam David
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date10797532.818.06.2010
WO2010US39193
Priority number, dateUS20090219560P23.06.2009         Original published format: US 219560 P
[2012/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011005459
Date:13.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2445751
Date:02.05.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011
[2012/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2445751
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR31.03.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60P3/20, H04L12/24, H04B5/00, H04B7/00, B60H1/00, B60H1/32, F25D29/00, B65D88/74, H04L29/08, H04W4/02
[2013/41]
Former International [2012/18]B60P3/20, H04L12/24, H04B5/00, H04B7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEISTUNGS- UND POSITIONSÜBERWACHUNG EINER MOBILEN HVAC&R-EINHEIT[2012/18]
English:PERFORMANCE AND POSITION MONITORING OF A MOBILE HVAC&R UNIT[2012/18]
French:SURVEILLANCE DES PERFORMANCES ET DE LA POSITION D'UNE UNITÉ MOBILE DE CHAUFFAGE, VENTILATION ET CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR (HVAC & R)[2012/18]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2012National basic fee paid 
10.01.2012Search fee paid 
10.01.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/18]
07.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2014Fee for grant paid
22.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.06.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Lumikko Technologies Oy
Kylmätie 1
60510 Hyllykallio / FI
Opponent's representative
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
 02  03.06.2015  11.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schmitz Cargobull AG
Siemensstraße 50
48341 Altenberge / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack, et al
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/29]
Opponent(s)01  02.06.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Lumikko Technologies Oy
Kylmätie 1
60510 Hyllykallio / FI
Opponent's representative
Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
 02  03.06.2015  11.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Schmitz Cargobull AG
Siemensstraße 50
48341 Altenberge / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz & Florack, et al
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
10.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.11.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.06.2018Date of oral proceedings
05.07.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.07.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition14.09.2018Appeal received No.  T2288/18
14.11.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.06.2010
AL03.09.2014
AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MK03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
SM03.09.2014
TR03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE18.06.2015
LU18.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU18.06.2010
AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MK03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
SM03.09.2014
TR03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE18.06.2015
LU18.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2017/38]HU18.06.2010
AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
SM03.09.2014
TR03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE18.06.2015
LU18.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2017/03]AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE18.06.2015
LU18.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2016/33]AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE18.06.2015
LU18.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2016/22]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE18.06.2015
LU18.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2016/20]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE18.06.2015
LU18.06.2015
Former [2016/11]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
LU18.06.2015
Former [2016/09]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/50]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/37]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/24]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/23]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/22]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/16]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT03.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1667059  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0108] - [0111]; figure 1 *;
 [XI]GB2408792  (MCCORMACK DEREK [IE]) [X] 1,9,11-13 * page 3, line 31 - page 5, line 29; figure 3 * [I] 2-8,10,14;
 [X]JP2004272752  (TOKYO MILK TRANSP INC) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] - [0029]; figure 1 *
International search[X]KR20070016305  (KIM JONG RYEOL);
 [Y]US5181389  (HANSON JAY L [US], et al)
by applicantEP1667059