Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2526695

EP2526695 - IMAGE ENCODER AND IMAGE DECODER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.12.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[2012/48]
Inventor(s)01 / THOMA, Herbert
Geschwister-Scholl-Straße 1
91058 Erlangen / DE
02 / MOTRA, Ajit
Gerhard-Hauptmann-Straße 11
91058 Erlangen / DE
 [2012/48]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/48]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann
Stöckeler, Zinkler & Partner
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach / DE
Application number, filing date10798364.530.12.2010
WO2010EP70915
Priority number, dateEP2010015107419.01.2010         Original published format: EP 10151074
[2012/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011088960
Date:28.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2526695
Date:28.11.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011
[2012/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/26, H03M7/24, H03M7/30
[2012/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/48]
TitleGerman:BILDCODIERER UND BILDDECODIERER[2012/48]
English:IMAGE ENCODER AND IMAGE DECODER[2012/48]
French:ENCODEUR D'IMAGE ET DÉCODEUR D'IMAGE[2012/48]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2012National basic fee paid 
03.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/48]
27.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
05.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
05.11.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination14.01.2015Appeal received No.  T0282/15
14.01.2015Statement of grounds filed
03.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.08.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
09.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
16.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
26.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
28.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[A]US2006047734  (BLAINEY ROBERT J [CA] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0030] *;
 [A]US6131104  (OBERMAN STUART F [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 27-30 *;
 [A]US6292815  (ABDALLAH MOHAMMAD A F [US] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * columns 1-2 *
 [IY]  - XU R ET AL, "High-dynamic-range still-image encoding in JPEG 2000", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/MCG.2005.133, (20051101), vol. 25, no. 6, ISSN 0272-1716, pages 57 - 64, XP008106211 [I] 1-4,7,8,11-13 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6,9,10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCG.2005.133
 [Y]  - LARSON G W, "LogLuv encoding for full-gamut, high-dynamic range images", JOURNAL OF GRAPHICS TOOLS, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, US, (19990122), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 1086-7651, pages 15 - 31, XP009133824 [Y] 5,6,9,10 * the whole document *