Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2515854

EP2515854 - Aerosol formualtion for COPD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/44]AEROSOL FORMULATION FOR COPD
[2013/35]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.02.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
12.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A.
Via Palermo, 26/A
43100 Parma / IT
[2012/44]
Inventor(s)01 / BONELLI, Sauro
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.P.A.
Via Palermo 26/A
I-43100 Parma / IT
02 / USBERTI, Francesca
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.P.A.
Via Palermo 26/A
I-43100 Parma / IT
03 / ZAMBELLI, Enrico
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.P.A.
Via Palermo 26/A
I-43100 Parma / IT
 [2013/35]
Former [2012/44]01 / BONELLI, Sauro
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.P.A.
Via Palermo 26/A
I-43100 Parma / IT
02 / USBERTI, Francesca
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.P.A.
Via Palermo 26/A
I-43100 Parma / IT
03 / ZAMBELLI, Enrico
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.P.A.
Via Palermo 26/A
I-43100 Parma / IT
Former [2011/33]01 / BONELLI, Sauro
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.P.A. Via Palermo 26/A
I-43100 Parma / IT
02 / USBERTI, Francesca
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.P.A. Via Palermo 26/A
I-43100 Parma / IT
03 / ZAMBELLI, Enrico
Chiesi Farmaceutici S.P.A. Via Palermo 26/A
I-43100 Parma / IT
Representative(s)Dempster, Robert Charles , et al
Script IP Limited
Turnpike House
18 Bridge Street
Frome
Somerset BA11 1BB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/44]Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date10799029.322.12.2010
WO2010EP70478
Priority number, dateEP2009001598023.12.2009         Original published format: EP 09015980
[2011/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011076842
Date:30.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2515854
Date:31.10.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011
[2012/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2515854
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K45/06, A61K31/40, A61K9/00, A61P11/06, A61P11/00, A61K9/12, A61K9/72
[2013/35]
Former International [2011/33]A61K9/00, A61K31/40
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/44]
Extension statesBA18.06.2012
ME18.06.2012
TitleGerman:Aerosol-Formulierungen für COPD[2013/48]
English:Aerosol formualtion for COPD[2013/48]
French:Formule d'aérosol pour COPD[2013/48]
Former [2012/44]AEROSOLFORMULIERUNG FÜR COPD
Former [2012/44]AEROSOL FORMULATION FOR COPD
Former [2012/44]Formule d'aérosol pour COPD
Entry into regional phase18.06.2012National basic fee paid 
18.06.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/44]
22.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2014Fee for grant paid
04.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.08.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.12.2014  08.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Elend, Almut Susanne
Venner Shipley LLP
Byron House
Cambridge Business Park
Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Johnson, Stephen William, et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
 [2015/07]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
27.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.07.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.09.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.10.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition21.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0038/17
28.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
26.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSM19.03.2014
[2017/37]
Former [2017/04]SM19.03.2014
IT22.12.2015
Former [2016/22]SM19.03.2014
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2004101483  (MULLER-WALZ RUDI [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0055]; example 4; claims 1-52 *;
 [Y]WO2005074900  (SOFOTEC GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 3, paragraph 3; example 2; claims 1-23 *;
 [Y]US2006257324  (LEWIS DAVID A [IT], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0044]; examples 1-7; claims 1-26 *
 [Y]  - "Glycopyrronium Bromide", Martindale The complete drug reference, Pharmaceutical Press, (20020101), vol. 33, pages 467 - 467, ISBN 0853694990, XP002579323 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2005107873
 WO0176575
 US2956062
 WO03053501
 WO0149350
    - HANSEL ET AL., CHEST, (2005), vol. 128, pages 1974 - 1979
    - FRANKO BV; LUNSFORD CD, J MED PHARM CHEM, (1960), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 523 - 540
    - European Pharmacopoeia, (2009), page 2.09.18
OppositionWO0007567
 WO9413262
    - BEAN et al., Advances in Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19670000), vol. 2, pages 38 - 41, XP055306225