blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2456356


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.08.2014 Withdrawal of application published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
31.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.05.2014 Supplementary search report published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
30.05.2014 Change - classification published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
30.05.2014 Change - classification published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
31.07.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.09.2012 Change - extension states published on  31.10.2012  [2012/44]
31.07.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.05.2012 Change - French title published on  20.06.2012  [2012/25]
27.04.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.05.2012  [2012/22]
27.04.2012 Request for examination filed published on  30.05.2012  [2012/22]
14.03.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
21.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
21.02.2012 Amendment by applicant
29.04.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
08.02.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
28.01.2011 PCT data prior to European publication