blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2456356
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9591974Global Dossier 14.03.2017B2
US2015351643 10.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
US84252810 23.07.2010
US201313940087 11.07.2013
US201514831618 20.08.2015
US201213486326 01.06.2012
US22824909 24.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9119526Global Dossier 01.09.2015B2
US2013304950 14.11.2013A1
Priority number Date
US84252810 23.07.2010
US201313940087 11.07.2013
US201213486326 01.06.2012
US22824909 24.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8499108Global Dossier 30.07.2013B2
US2012246375 27.09.2012A1
Priority number Date
US84252810 23.07.2010
US201213486326 01.06.2012
US22824909 24.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8214566Global Dossier 03.07.2012B2
US2011022748 27.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
US84252810 23.07.2010
US22824909 24.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2456356Global Dossier 02.07.2014A4
EP2456356 30.05.2012A2
Priority number Date
WO2010US43104 23.07.2010
US22824909 24.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2010275473C 27.02.2014C1
AU2010275473 09.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
WO2010US43104 23.07.2010
US22824909 24.07.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN202801580U 20.03.2013U
Priority number Date
WO2010US43104 23.07.2010
US22824909 24.07.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011011718Global Dossier 28.04.2011A3
WO2011011718 27.01.2011A2
Priority number Date
US22824909 24.07.2009