Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2456356

EP2456356 - CONFIGURABLE HEALTH-CARE EQUIPMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.08.2014
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2014Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.10.2014  [2014/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Welch Allyn, INC.
4341 State Street Road
Skaneateles Falls, NY 13153 / US
[2012/22]
Inventor(s)01 / EDWARDS, Ian, K.
28 East Austin Street
Skaneateles NY 13152 / US
02 / LIA, Raymond, A.
32 Chedell Place
Auburn NY 13021 / US
03 / MARTIN, Scott, A.
106 Golden Meadows Way
Warners NY 13164 / US
04 / SAVATI, Jon, R.
3552 County Line Road
Skaneateles NY 13152 / US
05 / VIVENZIO, Robert, L.
5825 Lake View Drive
Auburn NY 13021 / US
06 / WAWRO, Thaddeus, J.
93 Wilowbrook Drive
Auburn NY 13021 / US
07 / WOOD, Robert, J.
359 Woodbine Avenue
Syracuse NY 13021 / US
 [2012/22]
Representative(s)Heyer, Volker
Bockhorni & Kollegen
Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/22]Heyer, Volker
Bockhorni & Kollegen Elsenheimerstrasse 49
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date10802975.223.07.2010
WO2010US43104
Priority number, dateUS20090228249P24.07.2009         Original published format: US 228249 P
[2012/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011011718
Date:27.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2456356
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011
[2012/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR28.04.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/02, A61B1/227, A61B1/233, A61B3/12, A61B5/022
[2012/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/22]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE KONFIGURIERBARE PATIENTENPFLEGEAUSRÜSTUNG[2012/22]
English:CONFIGURABLE HEALTH-CARE EQUIPMENT APPARATUS[2012/22]
French:APPAREIL D'ÉQUIPEMENT DE SOINS DE SANTÉ CONFIGURABLE[2012/25]
Former [2012/22]APPAREIL D ÉQUIPEMENT DE SOINS DE SANTÉ CONFIGURABLE
Entry into regional phase14.02.2012National basic fee paid 
14.02.2012Search fee paid 
14.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/22]
27.08.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002044059  (REEDER RYAN A [US] ET AL) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0123] - [0125]; figures 35-38 *
International search[A]US2006179571  (NEWKIRK DAVID C.);
 [A]US2006039105  (SMITH SCOTT F. ET AL);
 [A]US2008281168  (GIBSON GRANT S. ET AL.);
 [A]US2009005651  (WARD SUZANNE MARIE ET AL.)