Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2456772

EP2456772 - COMPOUNDS, COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR PROTECTING BRAIN HEALTH IN NEURODEGENERATIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.05.2017  [2017/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amazentis SA
Parc Scientifique Epfl Pse-c
1024 Ecublens / CH
[2012/22]
Inventor(s)01 / RINSCH, Christopher
60 Rue De Lausanne
CH-1110 Morges / CH
02 / DUPRAZ, Philippe Victor, Leon
25 Chemin Du Ferrage
CH-1023 Crissier / CH
 [2012/22]
Representative(s)Trueman, Lucy Petra , et al
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/22]Trueman, Lucy Petra , et al
Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date10802978.623.07.2010
WO2010US43107
Priority number, dateUS20090228374P24.07.2009         Original published format: US 228374 P
[2012/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2011011721
Date:27.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2456772
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011
[2012/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR09.06.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D493/04, C07D407/10, A61K31/357, A61P25/28
[2012/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/22]
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGEN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERHALTUNG DER HIRNGESUNDHEIT BEI NEURODEGENERATIVEN ERKRANKUNGEN[2012/22]
English:COMPOUNDS, COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR PROTECTING BRAIN HEALTH IN NEURODEGENERATIVE DISORDERS[2012/22]
French:COMPOSÉS, COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE PROTECTION DE LA SANTÉ DU CERVEAU EN CAS DE TROUBLES NEURODÉGÉNÉRATIFS[2012/22]
Entry into regional phase20.02.2012National basic fee paid 
20.02.2012Search fee paid 
20.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/22]
09.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.05.2014Observations by third parties
31.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/20]
05.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/20]
Divisional application(s)EP16201224.9
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.03.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006022502  (HERBIO INC [KR], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * * claims 3,9-14 *;
 [X]WO2005089066  (RIMONEST LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]JP2009102288  (HARUNIRE BIO KENKYUSHO KK, et al) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]WO2008080162  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2009031023  (PROBELTE PHARMA S A [ES], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2006127832  (POM WONDERFUL LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - WASSEEM ROCK ET AL, "Consumption of Wonderful Variety Pomegranate Juice and Extract by Diabetic Patients Increases Paraoxonase 1 Association with High-Density Lipoprotein and Stimulates Its Catalytic Activities", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20080924), vol. 56, no. 18, doi:10.1021/jf801756x, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 8704 - 8713, XP055049536 [X] 1,2,4-6,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf801756x
 [X]  - MICHAEL AVIRAM ET AL, "Pomegranate Phenolics from the Peels, Arils, and Flowers Are Antiatherogenic: Studies in Vivo in Atherosclerotic Apolipoprotein E-Deficient (E 0 ) Mice and in Vitro in Cultured Macrophages and Lipoproteins", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20080201), vol. 56, no. 3, doi:10.1021/jf071811q, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 1148 - 1157, XP055049801 [X] 1,2,4-6,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf071811q
 [X]  - IKURO ABE ET AL, "Ellagitannins and Hexahydroxydiphenoyl Esters as Inhibitors of Vertebrate Squalene Epoxidase", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, (20010801), vol. 64, no. 8, doi:10.1021/np010100y, ISSN 0163-3864, pages 1010 - 1014, XP055049800 [X] 1,2,4-6,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np010100y
 [X]  - DAVID J LOREN ET AL, "Maternal Dietary Supplementation with Pomegranate Juice Is Neuroprotective in an Animal Model of Neonatal Hypoxic-Ischemic Brain Injury", PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, (20050601), vol. 57, no. 6, doi:10.1203/01.PDR.0000157722.07810.15, ISSN 0031-3998, pages 858 - 864, XP055049958 [X] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1203/01.PDR.0000157722.07810.15
 [X]  - HYE-MIN KWAK ET AL, "[beta]-Secretase(BACE1) inhibitors from pomegranate (Punica granatum) husk", ARCHIVES OF PHARMACAL RESEARCH, (20051201), vol. 28, no. 12, doi:10.1007/BF02977896, ISSN 0253-6269, pages 1328 - 1332, XP055049960 [X] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02977896
 [I]  - HARTMAN R E ET AL, "Pomegranate juice decreases amyloid load and improves behavior in a mouse model of Alzheimer's disease", NEUROBIOLOGY OF DISEASE, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 24, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.NBD.2006.08.006, ISSN 0969-9961, (20061201), pages 506 - 515, (20061201), XP024901473 [I] 1,6-9,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nbd.2006.08.006
 [X]  - KUMAR SOKINDRA ET AL, "Protective effects of Punica granatum seeds extract against aging and scopolamine induced cognitive impairments in mice.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (2008), Database accession no. NLM20162041, XP002690438 [X] 1 * abstract *
    [ ] - KUMAR SOKINDRA ET AL, "Protective effects of Punica granatum seeds extract against aging and scopolamine induced cognitive impairments in mice.", AFRICAN JOURNAL OF TRADITIONAL, COMPLEMENTARY, AND ALTERNATIVE MEDICINES : AJTCAM / AFRICAN NETWORKS ON ETHNOMEDICINES 2008, (2008), vol. 6, no. 1, ISSN 0189-6016, pages 49 - 56
otherEP1906980
    - "KAAFOOR BARAAE ZIABETUS", TKDL, Database accession no. AH3/4005, XP003035306
    - ALI IBN-E-ABBAAS MAJOOSI, KAAMIL-AL-SENA`AH, (2005), page 409, 2
    - "ANARA SARBATA", TKDL, Database accession no. RG12/1039, XP003035307
    - AYURVEDA SARASAMGRAHAH, (2003), page 526
    - "MUKTA PISTI UPAYOGA", TKDL, Database accession no. RG12/305G, XP003035308
    - AYURVEDA SARASAMGRAHAH, (2003), page 147
    - "SADAV", TKDL, Database accession no. RS6/951A, XP003035309
    - KAIYADEVA, KAIYADEVANIGHANTAU, (1979), pages 417 - 418
    - "SHARBAT-E GAOZABAN", TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/1259, XP003035310
    - MOHAMMAD AKBAR ARZANI, QARAABAADEEN QAADRI, (1968), page 186
    - "KHAMIRA ABRESHAM SHIRAH UNNABWALA", TKDL, Database accession no. NG/93, XP003035311
    - CARU CIKITSA, (1950), pages 29 - 30
    - "SUFOOF ARSATATALEES", TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/168, XP003035312
    - MOHAMMAD AKBAR ARZANI, QARAABAADEEN QAADRI, (1968), page 34