Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2652467

EP2652467 - APPARATUS FOR ESTIMATING A RESONANT FREQUENCY OF A WIND TURBINE TOWER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.07.2016
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KK Wind Solutions A/S
Bøgildvej 3
7430 Ikast / DK
[2015/46]
Former [2013/43]For all designated states
KK-Electronic A/S
Bøgildvej 3
7430 Ikast / DK
Inventor(s)01 / NIELSEN, Rasmus
Skovbrynet 92
DK-7330 Brande / DK
 [2013/43]
Representative(s)Patentgruppen A/S
Aaboulevarden 31, 4
8000 Aarhus C / DK
[N/P]
Former [2014/26]Olesen, Kaj , et al
Patentgruppen A/S
Aaboulevarden 31
4th Floor
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Former [2013/43]Jensen, Jacob
Høiberg A/S
St. Kongensgade 59 A
DK-1264 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date10803220.215.12.2010
WO2010DK50340
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012079574
Date:21.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2652467
Date:23.10.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2012
[2013/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01H13/00, F03D11/04
[2013/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/43]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHÄTZUNG EINER RESONANZFREQUENZ EINES WINDTURBINENTURMS[2013/43]
English:APPARATUS FOR ESTIMATING A RESONANT FREQUENCY OF A WIND TURBINE TOWER[2013/43]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR ESTIMER UNE FRÉQUENCE DE RÉSONANCE D'UNE TOUR D'ÉOLIENNE[2013/43]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2013National basic fee paid 
06.06.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/43]
19.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2016/33]
10.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/33]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201506   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP2103915  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1-19 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0034]; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP1643122  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,16 * paragraphs [0019] , [0024]; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2008081232  (CLIPPER WINDPOWER TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] 1,16 * page 9 - page 11 *;
 [A]US2010289266  (WORTMANN SVENJA [DE], et al) [A] 1,16 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0054] *
by applicantUS2009230682