Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2517133

EP2517133 - MANAGEMENT METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTATION, EXECUTION, DATA COLLECTION, AND DATA ANALYSIS OF A STRUCTURED COLLECTION PROCEDURE WHICH RUNS ON A COLLECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.09.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2016/36]For:DE 
Roche Diabetes Care GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Former [2012/44]For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BOUSAMRA, Steven
5277 Jefferson Roundabout
Carmel IN 46033 / US
02 / SONI, Abhishek, S.
4741 Grand Haven Lane
Apartment G
Indianapolis IN 46280 / US
 [2012/44]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/44]
Application number, filing date10803688.021.12.2010
WO2010US61573
Priority number, dateUS2010081831018.06.2010         Original published format: US 818310
US2009064341521.12.2009         Original published format: US 643415
US2009064333821.12.2009         Original published format: US 643338
[2012/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011084801
Date:14.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2517133
Date:31.10.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011
[2012/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2012/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/44]
TitleGerman:VERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG, AUSFÜHRUNG, DATENSAMMLUNG UND DATENANALYSE EINES STRUKTURIERTEN ENTNAHMEVERFAHRENS AUF EINER ENTNAHMEVORRICHTUNG[2012/44]
English:MANAGEMENT METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTATION, EXECUTION, DATA COLLECTION, AND DATA ANALYSIS OF A STRUCTURED COLLECTION PROCEDURE WHICH RUNS ON A COLLECTION DEVICE[2012/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE, L'EXÉCUTION, LA COLLECTE DE DONNÉES ET L'ANALYSE DE DONNÉES DE PROCÉDURE DE COLLECTE STRUCTURÉE LANCÉE SUR UN DISPOSITIF DE COLLECTE[2012/44]
Entry into regional phase23.07.2012National basic fee paid 
23.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/44]
07.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
27.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.10.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination11.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0434/18
30.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
06.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
08.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
10.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inby applicantUS6645368
 US7389133
 US2005016844
 US20090643415
 US20100140270
 US20100818310
 US20090643338
 US20060424757
 US20090492667
 US20070999968
 US20090491523
 US20070040458