Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2473508

EP2473508 - COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS AS TLR ACTIVITY MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2018No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.02.2018  [2018/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2017/10]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Former [2012/28]For all designated states
IRM LLC
131 Front Street P.O. Box HM 2899
Hamilton HM LX / BM
For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / CORTEZ, Alex
c/o Genomics Institute of the Novartis Research
Foundation
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
02 / LI, Yongkai
c/o Genomics Institute of the Novartis Research
Foundation
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
03 / SINGH, Manmohan
c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
04 / SKIBINSKI, David
c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics SRL
Via Fiorentina
53100 Siena / IT
05 / WU, Tom Yao-Hsiang
c/o Genomics Institute of the Novartis Research
Foundation
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
06 / YUE, Kathy
c/o Genomics Institute of the Novartis Research
Foundation
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
07 / ZHANG, Xiaoyue
c/o Genomics Institute of the Novartis Research
Foundation
10675 John Jay Hopkins Drive
San Diego
CA 92121 / US
 [2012/28]
Representative(s)von Sprecher, Georg , et al
Novartis AG
Corporate Intellectual Property
4002 Basel / CH
[2017/10]
Former [2012/28]Kiddle, Simon John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Application number, filing date10807754.601.09.2010
[2017/10]
WO2010US47587
Priority number, dateUS20090239217P02.09.2009         Original published format: US 239217 P
[2012/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011049677
Date:28.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2473508
Date:11.07.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011
[2012/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2473508
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, A61K31/395, A61P37/00
[2012/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ALS MODULATOREN DER TLR-AKTIVITÄT[2012/28]
English:COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS AS TLR ACTIVITY MODULATORS[2012/28]
French:COMPOSÉS ET COMPOSITIONS UTILISÉS EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS DE L'ACTIVITÉ TLR[2012/28]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2012National basic fee paid 
26.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/28]
20.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.11.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
01.11.2016Fee for grant paid
01.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.01.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
31.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.02.2014
Opposition(s)11.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]US5741909  (GERSTER JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 50; claim 2 *;
 [A]WO2007109813  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 1, line 8 - line 15 * * page 96; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2004111051  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 60; compound (70) *;
 [XP]WO2009111337  (IRM LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1-21 * page 356; claim 1 *;
 [E]WO2010144734  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [E] 1-21 * page 306; claim 19 *
by applicantWO9818931
 WO9818930
 US6699703
 US6800744
 WO9743303
 WO9737026
 WO02079241
 WO0234773
 WO0006737
 WO0006738
 WO0058475
 WO03082183
 WO0037105
 WO0222167
 WO0222168
 WO03104272
 WO0208426
 WO0112219
 WO9953940
 WO0181380
 WO2004092209
 WO0076540
 WO2007116322
 WO0234771
 WO2005032582
 WO02094851
 WO0218595
 WO9958562
 WO02094868
 WO2008019162
 WO02059148
 WO02102829
 WO03011899
 WO2005079315
 WO02077183
 WO9927109
 WO0170955
 WO0012689
 WO0012131
 WO2006032475
 WO2006032472
 WO2006032500
 WO2007113222
 WO2007113223
 WO2007113224
 WO03093306
 WO2004041157
 WO2005002619
 WO9924578
 WO9936544
 WO9957280
 WO02079243
 WO0037494
 WO03049762
 WO03068811
 WO0202606
 WO0022430
 WO9629412
 WO0164920
 WO03020756
 WO2004048404
 WO2004032958
 WO0209643
 US6180111
 WO0134642
 WO2004019977
 EP0011243
 WO0191788
 WO2005004908
 WO9856901
 WO0209746
 WO0200974
 WO02062378
 WO2004014417
 WO2006081259
 WO9910497
 WO03105890
 WO0152885
 US2008248065
 WO0025811
 WO2006024946
 WO2004092360
 WO2007120362
    - ERICKSON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, pages 4189 - 4199
    - DOE ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 2369 - 2376
    - EXPERT REV. VACCINES, (2007), vol. 46, no. 5, pages 685 - 698
    - VACCINES, (2007), vol. 25, pages 6618 - 6624
    - SAULNIER ET AL., BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (1994), vol. 4, page 1985
    - NATURE MEDICINE, (2007), vol. 13, pages 552 - 559
    - DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY: THERAPEUTIC STATEGIES, (2006), vol. 3, pages 343 - 352
    - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 174, pages 1259 - 1268
    - LEMIEUX ET AL., INFECT. IMM., (2006), vol. 74, pages 2453 - 2456
    - HOSKINS ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (2001), vol. 183, pages 5709 - 5717
    - ADAMOU ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (2001), vol. 69, no. 2, pages 949 - 958
    - BRILES ET AL., J. INFECT. DIS., (2000), vol. 182, pages 1694 - 1701
    - TALKINGTON ET AL., MICROB. PATHOG., (1996), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 17 - 22
    - BETHE ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (2001), vol. 205, no. 1, pages 99 - 104
    - BROWN ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (2001), vol. 69, pages 6702 - 6706
    - WHALEN ET AL., FEMS IMMUNOL. MED. MICROBIOL., (2005), vol. 43, pages 73 - 80
    - JOMAA ET AL., VACCINE, (2006), vol. 24, no. 24, pages 5133 - 5139
    - DALE, VACCINE, (1999), vol. 17, pages 193 - 200
    - DALE, VACCINE, vol. 14, no. 10, pages 944 - 948
    - ZHU ET AL., VACCINE, (2004), vol. 22, pages 660 - 669
    - PRICE ET AL., INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (2004), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 277 - 283
    - PLANTE ET AL., J INFECTIOUS DISEASE, (2000), vol. 182, pages 848 - 855
    - GIULIANI ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2006), vol. 103, no. 29, pages 10834 - 9
    - KATIAL ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (2002), vol. 70, pages 702 - 707
    - FREDRIKSEN ET AL., NIPH ANN., (1991), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 67 - 80
    - REAP ET AL., VACCINE, (2007), vol. 25, pages 7441 - 7449
    - GIULIANI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 10834 - 10839