Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2464363

EP2464363 - NATURAL EXTRACT FROM WHOLE BANANA FRUIT (MUSA SPP.) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  10.07.2015
Database last updated on 21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2017Change - prioritypublished on 19.04.2017  [2017/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medasani, Munisekhar
402 Mahitha Enclave Madhura Nagar Andhara Pradesh State
Hyderabad 500038 / IN
[2012/25]
Inventor(s)1 / see applicant
...
 [2012/25]
Representative(s)Chaillot, Denis Vincent , et al
Cabinet Chaillot
16/20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre
B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
[2012/25]
Application number, filing date10808028.411.08.2010
WO2010IB01994
Priority number, dateIN2009CHE191612.08.2009         Original published format: IN 1916CH2009
[2017/16]
Former [2012/25]IN2009CHE191612.08.2009
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011018700
Date:17.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2464363
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011
[2012/25]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
CN17.02.2011
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP10.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/88, A61K36/78, A61P9/12, A23L1/305
[2012/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/25]
Extension statesBA12.03.2012
ME12.03.2012
RS12.03.2012
TitleGerman:NATÜRLICHER EXTRAKT AUS GANZEN BANANEN (MUSA SPP.)[2012/25]
English:NATURAL EXTRACT FROM WHOLE BANANA FRUIT (MUSA SPP.)[2012/25]
French:EXTRAIT NATUREL DE FRUIT DE BANANE ENTIER (MUSA SPP.)[2012/25]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2012National basic fee paid 
12.03.2012Search fee paid 
12.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/25]
03.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.05.2014Observations by third parties
22.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.03.2015
20.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/33]
25.03.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.03.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/33]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.03.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Licence(s)deleted
[2012/25]
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4874617  (SOLE PEDRO [US]) [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2008102336  (GAN SHMUEL FOODS LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [XY]WO2004069143  (UNIV LIVERPOOL [GB], et al) [X] 1-16,20 * the whole document * [Y] 17-19;
 [A]US4267196  (JOHNSTON IAN F) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [AD]  - KAZUKI KANAZAWA ET AL, "High Content of Dopamine, a Strong Antioxidant, in Cavendish Banana", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20000301), vol. 48, no. 3, doi:10.1021/jf9909860, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 844 - 848, XP055068777 [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf9909860
 [A]  - T. P. WAALKES ET AL, "Serotonin, Norepinephrine, and Related Compounds in Bananas", SCIENCE, (19580321), vol. 127, no. 3299, doi:10.1126/science.127.3299.648, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 648 - 650, XP055068837 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.127.3299.648
 [A]  - FARID A. BADRIA, "Melatonin, Serotonin, and Tryptamine in Some Egyptian Food and Medicinal Plants", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL FOOD, (20020901), vol. 5, no. 3, doi:10.1089/10966200260398189, ISSN 1096-620X, pages 153 - 157, XP055068940 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/10966200260398189
 [A]  - Anonymous, "WHFoods: Banana", (20090211), pages 1 - 4, URL: ttp://web.archive.org/web/20090211151148/http://whfoods.com/genpage.php?tname=nutrientprofile&dbid=92, (20130701), XP055068945 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HAPPI EMAGA ET AL, "Effects of the stage of maturation and varieties on the chemical composition of banana and plantain peels", FOOD CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER LTD, NL, (20070215), vol. 103, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.FOODCHEM.2006.09.006, ISSN 0308-8146, pages 590 - 600, XP005891791 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodchem.2006.09.006
 [Y]  - CORDENUNSI ET AL, "Non-starch polysaccharide composition of two cultivars of banana (Musa acuminata L.: cvs Mysore and Nanicao)", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, LTD. BARKING, GB, (20071031), vol. 71, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.CARBPOL.2007.05.009, ISSN 0144-8617, pages 26 - 31, XP022323301 [Y] 17-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbpol.2007.05.009
 [Y]  - M. PILAR CANO ET AL, "A simple ion-exchange chromatographicd etermination of non-volatile organic acids in some Spanish exotic fruits", ZEITSCHRIFT F�R LEBENSMITTEL-UNTERSUCHUNG UND -FORSCHUNG, (19940901), vol. 199, no. 3, doi:10.1007/BF01193447, ISSN 0044-3026, pages 214 - 218, XP055069049 [Y] 17-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01193447
 [Y]  - THOMAS M. KENYHERCZ ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION AND QUANTITATION OF TRYPTOPHAN AND TYROSINE METABOLITES IN THE BANANA BY LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY WITH ELECTROCHEMICAL DETECTION", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, (19780701), vol. 43, no. 4, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2621.1978.tb15315.x, ISSN 0022-1147, pages 1354 - 1354, XP055069057 [Y] 17-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.1978.tb15315.x
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Banana peels for depression? - Supplements - LONGECITY", (20090404), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.longecity.org/forum/topic/28786-banana-peels-for-depression/, (20130628), XP055068784 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SCHEK A, "Influence of nutrition on depression and stress tolerance", ERNAHRUNGS UMSCHAU 200305 DE, (200305), vol. 50, no. 5, ISSN 0014-021X, pages 164 - 169+162, XP009170781 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO2005115423  (MEDASANI MUNISEKHAR [IN]);
 [X]US5972344  (EDWARDS BOBBY GENE [US]);
 [X]JP2005306780  (YUUSU TECHNO CORP KK)
by applicant   US5989559 A 19991123
    US4273792 A 19810616
    US4874617 A 19891017
    US3974301 A 19760810
    US4921709 A 19900501
    US6013260 A 20000111
    US6753019 B1 20040622
    US7098029 B1 20060829
    US5470879 A 19951128
    USRE34237E E 19930427
    WO2004069143 A2 20040819
    - S. VIJAYAKUMAR ET AL., FITOTERAPIA, (2008), vol. 79, pages 279 - 282,
    - "BIOGENESIS OF BANANA VOLATILES", J. AGR. FOODCHEM., (1973), vol. 21, no. 4,
    - "Differential Protein Accumulation in Banana Fruit during Ripening", PLANT PHYSIOL., (1992), vol. 98, pages 157 - 162,
    - "Banana Antioxidant", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2000), vol. 48, no. 3,
    - MELATONIN; SEROTONIN; TRYPTAMINE, "Some Egyptian Food and Medicinal Plants", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL FOOD, (2002), vol. 5, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1089/10966200260398189, XP055068940

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/10966200260398189
    - "Banana and Plantain fruit lectins", PLANTA, (2000), vol. 211, pages 546 - 554,
    - CAVENDISH BANANA, "High Content of Dopamine, a Strong Antioxidant", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2000), vol. 48, doi:doi:10.1021/jf9909860, pages 844 - 848, XP055068777

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf9909860
    - SCHEK A., Influence of nutrition on depression and stress tolerance, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (200305), vol. 50, pages 164 - 169,
other   - "RAMBLHAPHALA GUNA", DATABASE TKDL, (2005), XP003033956
    - "RAMBHAPHALA GUNA", HARITA, HARITA SAMHITA (ED. 1ST.), (2005), page 101,
    - "MADHANA KAMESWARAM", DATABASE TKDL, (1979), XP003033957
    - THERAYAR, THERAYAR SEKARAPPA (EDN. 1ST.), NEW DELHI, C.C.R.A.S, (1979), pages 98 - 100,
    - "BAHUMüTRANTAKARASAH", DATABASE TKDL, (2001), XP003033958
    - GOVINDA DASA, BHAISAJYA RATNAVALI (ED. 14TH.), (2001), page 808,
    - "KADALI PHALA", DATABASE TKDL, (1979), XP003033959
    - KAIYADEVA, KAIYADEVANIGHANTAU (PATHYA PATHYAVIBODHAKAH) (ED. 1ST.), (1979), pages 55 - 56,
    - "KIRAANIKKU LEGHYAM", DATABASE TKDL, (1976), XP003033960
    - "KIRAANIKKU LEGHYAM", AGASTHIYAR, AGATHIYAR KANMA KAANDAM (2TH. ED), (1976), pages 50 - 51,
    - "SALAYA-E-SAMM-UL-FAAR", DATABASE TKDL, (1930), XP003033961
    - "SALAYA-E-SAMM-UL-FAAR", KAREEM BAKHSH, MIFTAAH-AL-KHAZAAIN, (1930), pages 132 - 133,
    - "NARIKELA YOGA", DATABASE TKDL, (2005), XP003033962
    - "BASAVARAJA", BASAVARAJA, BASAVARAJIYAM-CHAUKHAMBHA, DELHI, (2005), page 124,
    - "DARVYADITAILAM", DATABASE TKDL, (1996), XP003033963
    - "DARVYADITAILAM", GANGA VISNU SRIKRSNA DASA, BRHAT NIGHANTU RATNAKARA, MUMBAI, (1996), vol. 3, page 526,
    - "MAUZ", DATABASE TKDL, (2005), XP003033964
    - "MAUZ", ALI IBN-E-ABBAAS MAJOOSI, KAAMIL-AL-SENA'AH, NEW DELHI, (2005), page 187,
    - "DAWA-E-MUQAWWI-E-BAAH", DATABASE TKDL, (1874), XP003033965
    - "DAWA-E-MUQAWWI-E-BAAH", ZIYA AL-ABLULLAH IBN AL BAITAR, DIN AL-JAAM'E-LI-MUFRADAAT-AL-ADVIA-WAL-AGHZIA, CAIRO, EGYPT, (1874), vol. IV, page 169,