Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473602

EP3473602 - PRODUCTION DEVICE FOR SILICA GLASS CRUCIBLE AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SILICA GLASS CRUCIBLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Super Quartz Corporation
5-14-3 Barajima Akita-shi
Akita 010-0065 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SUZUKI, Eriko
5-14-3, Barajima
Akita-shi Akita 010-0065 / JP
02 / KISHI, Hiroshi
5-14-3, Barajima
Akita-shi Akita 010-0065 / JP
03 / FUJITA, Takeshi
5-14-3, Barajima
Akita-shi Akita 010-0065 / JP
04 / SUDO, Toshiaki
5-14-3,Barajima,Akita-shi
Akita 0100065 / JP
 [2019/46]
Former [2019/17]01 / SUZUKI Eriko
5-14-3, Barajima
Akita-shi Akita 010-0065 / JP
02 / KISHI Hiroshi
5-14-3, Barajima
Akita-shi Akita 010-0065 / JP
03 / FUJITA Takeshi
5-14-3, Barajima
Akita-shi Akita 010-0065 / JP
04 / SUDO Toshiaki
5-14-3,Barajima,Akita-shi
Akita 0100065 / JP
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date10808195.109.08.2010
[2019/17]
WO2010JP63455
Priority number, dateJP2009018733312.08.2009         Original published format: JP 2009187333
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011019012
Date:17.02.2011
Language:JA
[2011/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473602
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3473602
Date:13.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.02.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:C03B20/00, C30B15/10, C30B29/06, H05B7/085
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES QUARZGLASTIEGELS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES QUARZGLASTIEGELS[2019/25]
English:PRODUCTION DEVICE FOR SILICA GLASS CRUCIBLE AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SILICA GLASS CRUCIBLE[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE CREUSET EN VERRE DE SILICE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CREUSET EN VERRE DE SILICE[2019/17]
Former [2019/17]VORSTELLUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SILICIUM-GLAS-TIEGELS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SILICIUM-GLAS-TIEGELS
Entry into regional phase27.01.2012Translation filed 
27.01.2012National basic fee paid 
27.01.2012Search fee paid 
27.01.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
27.01.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.2012Examination requested  [2019/17]
20.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2013Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.2019Fee for grant paid
07.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.06.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2009069773  (JAPAN SUPER QUARTZ CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,10;
 EP2226300  [ ] (JAPAN SUPER QUARTZ CORP [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0015] , [0017]; figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPS49140739U  (UNKNOWN) [A] 1,10 * figure 3 *;
 [A]US2002170316  (LEIST JOHANN [DE], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0014]; figure 1 *
International search[X]JPH01148718  (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK, et al);
 [X]WO2009069773  (JAPAN SUPER QUARTZ CORP [JP], et al)
by applicantJP2002154894
 JP2811290B
 JP2933404B