Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2516741

EP2516741 - ULTRA SMOOTH AND RECYCLABLE PRINTING SHEET AND ITS MANUFACTURING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/44]ULTRASMOOTH AND RECYCLABLE PRINTABLE SHEET AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME
[2013/18]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
17.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Arjo Wiggins Fine Papers Limited
Eversheds House 70 Great Bridgewater Street Manchester
M1 5ES / GB
[2012/44]
Inventor(s)01 / DEPRES, Gaël
Chemin de Molarot
Clermont
F-38850 Chirens / FR
02 / VAU, Jean-Marie
245 rue de Bercy
F-75012 Paris / FR
 [2012/44]
Representative(s)Desaix, Anne , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S.
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/44]Desaix, Anne , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date10809308.922.12.2010
WO2010FR52879
Priority number, dateFR2009000632523.12.2009         Original published format: FR 0906325
[2012/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011077048
Date:30.06.2011
Language:FR
[2011/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2516741
Date:31.10.2012
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011
[2012/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2516741
Date:06.08.2014
Language:FR
[2014/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:D21H27/22, D21H27/00, D21H19/00, D21H19/36, D21H19/66, D21H19/80, D21H23/10, D21H23/22, D21H23/66, D21H23/70, D21H23/72, B41M5/40, B41M5/50, B41M5/52
[2012/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ULTRAGLATTES UND WIEDERVERWERTBARES AUFZEICHNUNGSBLATT UND SEIN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[2013/18]
English:ULTRA SMOOTH AND RECYCLABLE PRINTING SHEET AND ITS MANUFACTURING PROCESS[2013/18]
French:FEUILLE IMPRIMABLE ULTRA LISSE ET RECYCLABLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2012/44]
Former [2012/44]ULTRAGLATTES UND RECYCLINGFÄHIGES BEDRUCKBARES BLATT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR
Former [2012/44]ULTRASMOOTH AND RECYCLABLE PRINTABLE SHEET AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SAME
Entry into regional phase24.05.2012National basic fee paid 
24.05.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
24.05.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/44]
30.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2014Fee for grant paid
23.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.04.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.05.2015  12.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
Zinsinger, Norbert, et al
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Merianstrasse 26
90409 Nürnberg / DE
 [2015/25]
16.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
14.02.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition13.04.2017Appeal received No.  T0955/17
23.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
03.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.12.2010
AL06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MK06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
TR06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU22.12.2010
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MK06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
TR06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/33]HU22.12.2010
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
TR06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/32]HU22.12.2010
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/27]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/22]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
SM06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/50]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/47]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/46]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE22.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
Former [2015/35]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
LU22.12.2014
Former [2015/23]CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/22]CY06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RS06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/10]LT06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
Former [2015/08]LT06.08.2014
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2001009696  (KUME KATSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,11,12 * paragraphs [0004] , [00 9] , [0010] , [0015] , [0027] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0033] , [0036] , [0038] * [Y] 1-23;
 [XY]EP0454428  (OJI PAPER CO [JP]) [X] 19,22,23 * page 4, line 41 - line 46; figure 1 * * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 17 * * page 10, line 11 - line 33 * * page 6, line 25 - line 28 * [Y] 19-23;
 [XY]EP0474494  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8,11,12,19 * example A11 * * page 3, line 32 - line 39 * * page 4, line 41 - line 50 * * page 5, line 29 - line 42 * * page 7, line 34 - page 9, line 6 * [Y] 1-23;
 [X]US4867844  (DESSAUER GUIDO [DE]) [X] 19 * example 3 *;
 [A]EP2045090  (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *
OppositionWO2007045431
 DE2747241
 WO2006108607
 WO2004037656
 EP0474494
 WO2007097378
 WO9316888
 WO2005095118
 EP1584647
 DE19628341