Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2472364

EP2472364 - INPUT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.01.2018
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyocera Corporation
6 Takedatobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
[2012/27]
Inventor(s)01 / KONO, Kenji
c/o KYOCERA Corporation
Yokohama Office
1-1 Kagahara 2-chome
Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8502 / JP
 [2012/27]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/52]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte
Stuntzstraße 16
81677 München / DE
Former [2012/27]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date10811447.105.08.2010
[2015/52]
WO2010JP04940
Priority number, dateJP2009019731827.08.2009         Original published format: JP 2009197318
[2012/27]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011024388
Date:03.03.2011
Language:JA
[2011/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2472364
Date:04.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2472364
Date:23.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.03.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/041, G06F3/01
[2013/12]
Former International [2012/27]G06F3/041
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINGABEVORRICHTUNG[2012/27]
English:INPUT DEVICE[2012/27]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENTRÉE[2012/27]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2012Translation filed 
27.02.2012National basic fee paid 
27.02.2012Search fee paid 
27.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/27]
06.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2015Fee for grant paid
26.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.06.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.09.2016  28.09.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Preh GmbH
Schweinfurter Strasse 5-9
97616 Bad Neustadt a.d. Saale / DE
Opponent's representative
Lohmanns, Bernard
Benrather Schlossallee 49-53
40597 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2016/44]
28.10.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.02.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.01.2018Date of oral proceedings
30.01.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.01.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition29.03.2018Appeal received No.  T0867/18
29.05.2018Statement of grounds filed
05.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.08.2010
AL23.12.2015
AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
BG23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
TR23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
IE05.08.2016
LU05.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU05.08.2010
AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
BG23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
TR23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
IE05.08.2016
LU05.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
Former [2018/33]HU05.08.2010
AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
TR23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
IE05.08.2016
LU05.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
MT31.08.2016
Former [2018/29]HU05.08.2010
AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
TR23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
IE05.08.2016
LU05.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2018/28]HU05.08.2010
AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CY23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
MK23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
IE05.08.2016
LU05.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/41]AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
IE05.08.2016
LU05.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/23]AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/15]AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
MC23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SI23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2017/03]AT23.12.2015
BE23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/46]AT23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
DK23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/38]AT23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
SM23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
IS23.04.2016
PT26.04.2016
Former [2016/36]AT23.12.2015
CZ23.12.2015
EE23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
PL23.12.2015
RO23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
SK23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/35]CZ23.12.2015
ES23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ23.12.2015
FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/26]FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
NL23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
LV23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI23.12.2015
HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
GR24.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR23.12.2015
LT23.12.2015
SE23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT23.12.2015
NO23.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT23.12.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002149561  (FUKUMOTO MASAAKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0270] - [0275] - [0290] *
International search[X]JPH10293644  (IDEC IZUMI CORP)
by applicantJP2003288158
 JP2008130055
OppositionUS2008024459
 US7292227
 US2001035854
 US2007229455