Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2472716

EP2472716 - ANOMALY DETECTION DEVICE FOR A PERMANENT MAGNET SYNCHRONOUS ELECTRIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
For all designated states
Meidensha Corporation
1-1, Osaki 2-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-6029 / JP
[2012/27]
Inventor(s)01 / TANIMOTO, Tsutomu
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
IP department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / IMAZU, Tomoya
c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
IP department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
03 / NAKANO, Yoshinori
c/o Meidensha Corporation
1-1,Osaki 2 chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-6029 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2012/27]01 / TANIMOTO, Tsutomu
c/o Nissan Motor Co. Ltd., IP department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / IMAZU, Tomoya
c/o Nissan Motor Co. Ltd., IP department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
03 / NAKANO, Yoshinori
c/o Meidensha Corporation
2-1-1-Osaki
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-6029 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/27]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date10811984.327.08.2010
WO2010JP64554
Priority number, dateJP2009019804128.08.2009         Original published format: JP 2009198041
[2012/27]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011024935
Date:03.03.2011
Language:JA
[2011/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2472716
Date:04.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.03.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02P5/74, H02P21/00, H02P27/04, H02P29/66, H02P5/50, H02P6/04, H02P21/14, B60L3/00
[2017/21]
Former International [2012/27]H02P5/74, H02P21/00, H02P27/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/27]
TitleGerman:STÖRUNGSERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN SYNCHRONEN PERMANENTMAGNETELEKTROMOTOR[2012/27]
English:ANOMALY DETECTION DEVICE FOR A PERMANENT MAGNET SYNCHRONOUS ELECTRIC MOTOR[2012/27]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'ANOMALIE POUR UN MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE SYNCHRONE À AIMANT PERMANENT[2012/27]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2012Translation filed 
27.02.2012National basic fee paid 
27.02.2012Search fee paid 
27.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/27]
07.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
26.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
29.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2009072049  (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [ 29] * * figures 1, 3 *;
 [A]JPH11356099  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs 0002, 0019, 0048, 0053 and 0063 of the computer translation * * figure 4 *
International search[A]JP2006014554  (TOYO ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD);
 [A]JP2004072931  (NISSAN MOTOR);
 [A]JP2007274779  (AISIN AW CO)
by applicantJP2002095300
 JP2009198041