Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2470636

EP2470636 - MULTI-LAYER BLOOD COMPONENT EXCHANGE DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.07.2013
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.08.2013  [2013/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York
412 Low Memorial Library 535 West 116th Street Mail Code 4308
New York, NY 10027 / US
[2012/27]
Inventor(s)01 / REICH, Ilan, K.
200 Chambers Street, 28A
New York NY 10007 / US
02 / LEONARD, Edward, F.
29 Rossmore Avenue
Bronxville NY 10708 / US
03 / HILL, Michael
62 Heather Lane
Wyckoff NJ 07481 / US
04 / HOWARD, John
80 Leach Street
Salem MA 01970 / US
 [2012/27]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/27]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date10812679.827.08.2010
WO2010US47041
Priority number, dateUS20100293956P11.01.2010         Original published format: US 293956 P
US20090238068P28.08.2009         Original published format: US 238068 P
[2012/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011025986
Date:03.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2470636
Date:04.07.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011
[2012/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:C12M1/34, G01N33/558
[2012/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/27]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSTAUSCH EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN BLUTKOMPONENTE[2012/27]
English:MULTI-LAYER BLOOD COMPONENT EXCHANGE DEVICES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS[2012/27]
French:DISPOSITIFS MULTICOUCHES D'ÉCHANGE DE COMPOSANTS DU SANG, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS[2012/27]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2012National basic fee paid 
27.03.2012Search fee paid 
27.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/27]
01.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/35]
11.04.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/35]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201203   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2009139931  (LEONARD ET AL.);
 [Y]US2007054293  (UU ET AL.);
 [Y]US2007026381  (HUANG ET AL.);
 [Y]US7294503  (QUAKE ET AL.)
 [Y]  - BURGESS ET AL., "?Towards microfabricated biohybrid artificial lung modules for chronic respiratory support?", BIOMED MICRODEVICES, vol. 11, (2009), pages 117 - 127., URL: http://www.springerlink.com/content/u63023781741r188, (20101129), XP019670951