Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2510011

EP2510011 - MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES THAT BIND B7H6 AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.08.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
01.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale
101, Rue de Tolbiac
75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR
[2014/08]
Former [2012/42]For all designated states
INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE
101, rue de Tolbiac
75654 Paris Cédex 13 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / PIERRES, Michel
Le Belvédère
63, chemin du Mozambique
13016 Marseille / FR
02 / VIVIER, Eric
Chemin des Cuettes
13260 Cassis / FR
03 / BARATIN, Myriam
8, hameau des Gorguettes
Route de Carnoux
13260 Cassis / FR
 [2012/42]
Representative(s)Griffin, Philippa Jane
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2014/38]
Former [2012/42]Griffin, Philippa Jane
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date10813116.008.12.2010
WO2010IB03411
Priority number, dateUS20090285018P09.12.2009         Original published format: US 285018 P
[2012/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011070443
Date:16.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2510011
Date:17.10.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011
[2012/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2510011
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/30, A61K39/00, C07K16/28, A61K39/395
[2016/51]
Former International [2012/42]C07K16/28, A61K39/395
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:B7H6 -BINDENDE MONOKLONALE ANTIKÖRPER UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2012/42]
English:MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES THAT BIND B7H6 AND USES THEREOF[2012/42]
French:ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX QUI SE LIENT À B7H6 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2012/42]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase03.07.2012National basic fee paid 
03.07.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.2011Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/42]
01.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2014Fee for grant paid
05.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.08.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.06.2015   
James Poole Limited
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Opponent's representative
Wise, Daniel Joseph, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 [2015/30]
22.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition10.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0407/17
06.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
03.11.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY08.12.2016
AT08.12.2017
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
IE08.12.2017
IT08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
LU08.12.2017
LV08.12.2017
MT08.12.2017
PL08.12.2017
RO08.12.2017
SK08.12.2017
ES09.12.2017
HU09.12.2017
SE09.12.2017
SI09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
DK31.12.2017
EE31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
NO31.12.2017
NL01.01.2018
MC02.01.2018
PT08.06.2018
RS11.06.2018
GR05.07.2018
BG06.07.2018
SM16.07.2018
IS31.07.2018
[2019/35]
Former [2019/30]CY08.12.2016
AT08.12.2017
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
IE08.12.2017
IT08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
LU08.12.2017
LV08.12.2017
MT08.12.2017
PL08.12.2017
RO08.12.2017
SK08.12.2017
HU09.12.2017
SE09.12.2017
SI09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
DK31.12.2017
EE31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
NO31.12.2017
NL01.01.2018
MC02.01.2018
PT08.06.2018
RS11.06.2018
GR05.07.2018
BG06.07.2018
SM16.07.2018
IS31.07.2018
Former [2019/22]CY08.12.2016
AT08.12.2017
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
IE08.12.2017
IT08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
LU08.12.2017
LV08.12.2017
MT08.12.2017
PL08.12.2017
RO08.12.2017
SK08.12.2017
HU09.12.2017
SE09.12.2017
SI09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
DK31.12.2017
EE31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
NO31.12.2017
NL01.01.2018
PT08.06.2018
RS11.06.2018
GR05.07.2018
BG06.07.2018
SM16.07.2018
IS31.07.2018
Former [2019/11]CY08.12.2016
AT08.12.2017
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
IE08.12.2017
IT08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
LU08.12.2017
LV08.12.2017
MT08.12.2017
RO08.12.2017
SK08.12.2017
HU09.12.2017
SE09.12.2017
SI09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
DK31.12.2017
EE31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
NO31.12.2017
NL01.01.2018
PT08.06.2018
RS11.06.2018
GR05.07.2018
BG06.07.2018
SM16.07.2018
IS31.07.2018
Former [2019/08]CY08.12.2016
AT08.12.2017
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
IE08.12.2017
IT08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
LU08.12.2017
LV08.12.2017
MT08.12.2017
RO08.12.2017
SK08.12.2017
HU09.12.2017
SE09.12.2017
SI09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
DK31.12.2017
EE31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
NO31.12.2017
NL01.01.2018
PT08.06.2018
RS11.06.2018
GR05.07.2018
SM16.07.2018
IS31.07.2018
Former [2018/52]CY08.12.2016
AT08.12.2017
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
IE08.12.2017
IT08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
LU08.12.2017
LV08.12.2017
MT08.12.2017
RO08.12.2017
SK08.12.2017
HU09.12.2017
SE09.12.2017
SI09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
EE31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
NO31.12.2017
NL01.01.2018
PT08.06.2018
RS11.06.2018
GR05.07.2018
SM16.07.2018
IS31.07.2018
Former [2018/51]CY08.12.2016
AT08.12.2017
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
IE08.12.2017
IT08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
LU08.12.2017
LV08.12.2017
MT08.12.2017
RO08.12.2017
SK08.12.2017
HU09.12.2017
SE09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
EE31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
NO31.12.2017
NL01.01.2018
PT08.06.2018
RS11.06.2018
IS31.07.2018
Former [2018/50]CY08.12.2016
AT08.12.2017
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
IE08.12.2017
IT08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
LU08.12.2017
LV08.12.2017
MT08.12.2017
RO08.12.2017
SK08.12.2017
HU09.12.2017
SE09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
EE31.12.2017
NO31.12.2017
NL01.01.2018
PT08.06.2018
RS11.06.2018
Former [2018/49]CY08.12.2016
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
IE08.12.2017
IT08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
LU08.12.2017
LV08.12.2017
MT08.12.2017
RO08.12.2017
HU09.12.2017
SE09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
EE31.12.2017
NO31.12.2017
NL01.01.2018
PT08.06.2018
RS11.06.2018
Former [2018/47]CY08.12.2016
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
IE08.12.2017
IT08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
LU08.12.2017
LV08.12.2017
MT08.12.2017
RO08.12.2017
SE09.12.2017
NO31.12.2017
NL01.01.2018
PT08.06.2018
RS11.06.2018
Former [2018/45]CY08.12.2016
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
IE08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
LU08.12.2017
LV08.12.2017
MT08.12.2017
RO08.12.2017
SE09.12.2017
NL01.01.2018
PT08.06.2018
RS11.06.2018
Former [2018/43]CY08.12.2016
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
LU08.12.2017
LV08.12.2017
MT08.12.2017
RO08.12.2017
SE09.12.2017
NL01.01.2018
PT08.06.2018
RS11.06.2018
Former [2018/41]CY08.12.2016
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
LV08.12.2017
RO08.12.2017
SE09.12.2017
PT08.06.2018
RS11.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY08.12.2016
CZ08.12.2017
FI08.12.2017
HR08.12.2017
LT08.12.2017
PT08.06.2018
Former [2017/43]CY08.12.2016
Former [2015/18]deleted
Former [2015/12]LV17.09.2014
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2009046407  (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-53 * the whole document *;
 [IA]WO0151514  (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]) [I] 1-8,53 * the whole document * [A] 9-52;
 [A]WO2006124668  (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-53 * the whole document *;
 [I]  - BRANDT CAMERON S ET AL, "The B7 family member B7-H6 is a tumor cell ligand for the activating natural killer cell receptor NKp30 in humans", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY PRESS, US, vol. 206, no. 7, doi:DOI:10.1084/JEM.20090681, ISSN 0022-1007, (20090706), pages 1495 - 1503, (20090615), XP009145615 [I] 1-53 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20090681
 [A]  - VON STRANDMANN ELKE POGGE ET AL, "Human leukocyte antigen-B-associated transcript 3 is released from tumor cells and engages the NKp30 receptor on natural killer cells", IMMUNITY, CELL PRESS, US, (20071201), vol. 27, no. 6, ISSN 1074-7613, pages 965 - 974, XP009145630 [A] 1-53 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MORETTA LORENZO ET AL, "Unravelling natural killer cell function: Triggering and inhibitory human NK receptors", EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20040128), vol. 23, no. 2, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 255 - 259, XP009145631 [A] 1-53 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SCHLEINITZ NICOLAS ET AL, "Expression of the CD85j (Leukocyte Ig-like Receptor 1, Ig-like Transcript 2) Receptor for Class I Major Histocompatibility Complex Molecules in Idiopathic Inflammatory Myopathies", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, vol. 58, no. 10, ISSN 0004-3591, (20081001), pages 3216 - 3223, (20080929), XP009147259 [A] 1-53 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5082833
 US4883662
 US2009220502
 WO2008131242
 US5580717
 US5885793
 US5969108
 US6040136
 US5571698
 US4331647
 US4946778
 US5693762
 WO8912624
 WO2004010957
 US6214345
 US5122368
 US5824805
 US5622929
 US4880935
 US2003083263
 WO02088172
 US6884869
 US6323315
 US6239104
 US6034065
 US5780588
 US5665860
 US5663149
 US5635483
 US5599902
 US5554725
 US5530097
 US5521284
 US5504191
 US5410024
 US5138036
 US5076973
 US4986988
 US4978744
 US4879278
 US4816444
 US4486414
 US6130237
 US5665358
 US5643573
 US5556623
 JPH04244018
    - CHAMBERS ET AL., ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 19, pages 565 - 594
    - EGEN ET AL., NATURE IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 3, pages 611 - 618
    - ABBAS ET AL., NAT. MED., (1999), vol. 5, pages 1345 - 6
    - COYLE ET AL., NAT. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 2, pages 203 - 9
    - CARRENO ET AL., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 29 - 53
    - LIANG ET AL., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 14, pages 384 - 90
    - CUDOWICZ; BENNETT, J. EXP. MED., (1971), vol. 134, pages 83 - 102
    - CUDOWICZ; BENNETT, J. EXP. MED., (1971), vol. 135, pages 1513 - 1528
    - HERBERMAN; ORTALDO, SCIENCE, (1981), vol. 214, pages 24 - 30
    - ORTALDO; HERBERMAN, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 2, pages 359 - 394
    - TRINCHIERI, ADV. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 47, pages 187 - 376
    - MURPHY ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1993), vol. 85, pages 1475 - 1482
    - MURPHY ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1987), vol. 165, pages 1212 - 1217
    - YAMAZAKI ET AL., ONCOLOGY REPORTS, (2002), vol. 9, pages 359 - 363
    - ROSENBERG ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 51, pages 5074 - 5079
    - BRITTEENDEN ET AL., CANCER, (1996), vol. 77, pages 1226 - 1243
    - BARAO; MURPHY, BB&MT, (2003), vol. 9, pages 727 - 741
    - LJUNGGREN; KARRE, IMMUNOL. TODAY, (1990), vol. 11, pages 237 - 244
    - OHLEN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 145, pages 52 - 58
    - STORKUS ET AL., PROC. NATT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 2361 - 2364
    - SHIMIZU; DEMARS, EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 19, pages 447 - 451
    - MORETTA ET AL., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 19, pages 197 - 223
    - DIEFENBACH; RAULET, IMMUNOL. REV., (2001), vol. 181, pages 170 - 184
    - BRANDT ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2009), vol. 206, no. 7, pages 1495 - 1503
    - PUTNAM, The Plasma Proteins, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., (1987), vol. V, pages 49 - 140
    - PADLAN, MOL. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 31, pages 169 - 217
    - NILSSON ET AL., EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, page 1075
    - NILSSON ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1991), vol. 198, page 3
    - SMITH; JOHNSON, GENE, (1988), vol. 67, page 31
    - GRUSSENMEYER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 7952
    - HOPP ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 1204
    - FORD ET AL., PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (1991), vol. 2, page 95
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1994), vol. 1
    - The Epitope Mapping Protocols, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (1996), vol. 66
    - NAGATA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2004), vol. 292, pages 141 - 155
    - SCATCHARD, ANN. NY ACAD. SCI., (1949), vol. 51, page 660
    - JAMESON; WOLF, CABIOS, (1988), vol. 4, page 181
    - HOPP ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1981), vol. 78, page 3824
    - EMINI ET AL., J. VIROLOGY, (1985), vol. 55, page 836
    - KARPLUS; SCHULTZ, NATURWISSENSCHAFTEN, (1985), vol. 72, page 212
    - "Prediction of Protein Structural Classes from Amino Acid Composition", CHOU, Prediction of Protein Structure and the Principles of Protein Conformation, PLENUM PRESS, (1990), pages 549 - 586
    - GAMIER ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1978), vol. 120, page 97
    - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495
    - Current Protocols in Immunology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1991), vol. 1, pages 2.5.1 - 2.6.7
    - GREEN ET AL., NATURE GENET., (1994), vol. 7, page 13
    - LONBERG ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, page 856
    - TAYLOR ET AL., INT. IMMUN., (1994), vol. 6, page 579
    - "Purification of Immunoglobulin G (IgG)", BAINES ET AL., Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, INC., (1992), vol. 10, pages 79 - 104
    - HUSE, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281
    - NISONOFF ET AL., ARCH BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1960), vol. 89, page 230
    - PORTER, BIOCHEM. J., (1959), vol. 73, page 119
    - EDELMAN ET AL., Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1967), vol. I, page 422
    - INBAR ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1972), vol. 69, page 2659
    - SANDHU, CRIT. REV. BIOTECH., (1992), vol. 12, page 437
    - WHITLOW ET AL., METHODS: A COMPANION TO METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1991), vol. 2, page 97
    - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, page 423
    - PACK ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 11, page 1271
    - LARRICK ET AL., METHODS: A COMPANION TO METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1991), vol. 2, page 106
    - "Genetic Manipulation of Monoclonal Antibodies", COURTENAY-LUCK ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies: Production, Engineering and Clinical Application, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1995), vol. 166
    - "Genetic Manipulation and Expression of Antibodies", WARD ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Applications, WILEY-LISS, INC., (1995), vol. 137
    - ORLANDI ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 3833
    - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, page 522
    - CARTER ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 4285
    - SINGER ET AL., J IMMUN., (1993), vol. 150, page 2844
    - "Engineering Therapeutic Antibodies", KELLEY ET AL., Protein Engineering: Principles and Practice, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1996), pages 399 - 434
    - WINES ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, page 5313
    - WOOF; BURTON, NATURE REVIEWS, (2004), vol. 4, page 1
    - GETIE; WARD, IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1997), vol. 18, page 592
    - PETKOVA ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 18, page 1759
    - KENNEDY ET AL., CLIN. CHIM. ACTA, (1976), vol. 70, page 1
    - SCHURS ET AL., CLIN. CHIM. ACTA, (1977), vol. 81, page 1
    - SHIH ET AL., INT'L J. CANCER, (1990), vol. 46, page 1101
    - STEIN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1990), vol. 50, page 1330
    - "Avidin-Biotin Technology", Methods In Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), vol. 184
    - "Immunochemical Applications of Avidin-Biotin Technology", BAYER ET AL., Methods In Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, INC., (1992), vol. 10, pages 149 - 162
    - "Monoclonal Antibodies in Diagnostic Immunoassays", COOK; SELF, Monoclonal Antibodies: Production, Engineering, and Clinical Application, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1995), pages 180 - 208
    - "The Role of Monoclonal Antibodies in the Advancement of Immunoassay Technology", PERRY, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Applications, WILEY-LISS, INC., (1995), pages 107 - 120
    - THORPE ET AL., Immunol. Rev., (1982), vol. 62, pages 119 - 58
    - DUBOWCHIK; WALKER, PHARM. THERAPEUTICS, (1999), vol. 83, pages 67 - 123
    - NEVILLE ET AL., BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, pages 14653 - 14661
    - THORPE ET AL., CANCER RES., (1987), vol. 47, pages 5924 - 5931
    - JOHNSON ET AL., ANTICANCER RES., (1995), vol. 15, pages 1387 - 93
    - LAU ET AL., BIOORG-MED-CHEM., (1995), vol. 3, pages 1299 - 1304
    - LAU ET AL., BIOORG-MED-CHEM., (1995), vol. 3, pages 1305 - 12
    - LI ET AL., CANCER RES., (1982), vol. 42, pages 999 - 1004
    - CHARI ET AL., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 127 - 131
    - PAGE ET AL., INTL. J. OF ONCOLOGY, (1993), vol. 3, pages 473 - 476
    - SKEHAN, J. NAT'L CANCER INST., (1990), vol. 82, pages 1107 - 12
    - MOSMANN, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1983), vol. 65, pages 55 - 63
    - BIOCHEMICA, (1999), vol. 2, pages 34 - 37
    - DUKE; COHEN ET AL., Current Protocols In Immunology, (1992), pages 3.17.1 - 3.17.16
    - PIAZZA ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 55, pages 3110 - 16
    - SRIVASTAVA; SRIVASTAVA, LEUK. RES., (2006), vol. 30, pages 37 - 46
    - MURPHY ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1987), vol. 166, pages 1499 - 1509
    - MURPHY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 144, pages 3305 - 3311
    - MURPHY ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 20, pages 1729 - 1734
    - MURPHY ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (2001), vol. 181, pages 279 - 289
    - O'REILLY ET AL., VOX. SANG., (1986), vol. 51, pages 81 - 86
    - SCOTT ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 92, pages 4864 - 4871
    - LJUNGGREN; MALMBERG, NATURE REV. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 7, pages 329 - 339
    - BOYTON; ALTMANN, CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 149, pages 1 - 8
    - REN, LEUKEMIA AND LYMPHOMA, (2002), vol. 8, pages 1549 - 1561
    - VAN ETTEN, BLOOD CELLS MOL. DIS., (2001), vol. 27, pages 201 - 205
    - WONG; WITTE, ONCOGENE, (2001), vol. 20, pages 5644 - 5659
    - MIYAKAWA ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2004), vol. 313, pages 258 - 62
    - ANSELL ET AL., LEUKEMIA, (2004), vol. 18, pages 616 - 23
    - OTTENSMEIER, CHEMICO-BIOLOGICAL INTERACTIONS, (2001), pages 135 - 136,653-664
    - "The Non-Hodgkin's Lymphoma Pathologic Classification Project", CANCER, (1982), vol. 49, pages 2112 - 35
    - "Lymphoid neoplasms", American Joint Committee on Cancer.: AJCC Cancer Staging Manual, SPRINGER, (2002), pages 393 - 406
    - BOYE, ANNALS OF ONCOL., (2003), vol. 14, pages 520 - 535
    - DOWNS ET AL., GYNECOL. ONCOL., (2005), vol. 98, pages 203 - 10
    - LI, INT. J. GYNECOL. CANCER, (2005), vol. 15, pages 301 - 7
    - KURIAKOSE ET AL., HEAD NECK, (2000), vol. 22, pages 57 - 63
    - CAO ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 5, pages 1925 - 34
    - BRAAKHUIS ET AL., CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, pages 211 - 4
    - BAKER, LARYNGOSCOPE, (1985), vol. 95, pages 43 - 56
    - BELLO ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2002), vol. 8, pages 3539 - 48
    - QUIDVILLE ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2004), vol. 145, pages 2561 - 71
    - ZHOU ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 9, pages 6030 - 7
    - NEMATI ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 6, pages 2075 - 86
    - HU ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 10, pages 7662 - 70
    - THERASSE, J. NATL. CANCER INST., (2000), vol. 92, pages 205 - 216
    - SMYTH ET AL., NE.IM, (2006), vol. 354, page 2282
    - BREMER ET AL., PHARNI. BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 10, page 239
    - "Implants in Drug Delivery", RANADE, Drug Delivery Systems, CRC PRESS, (1995), pages 95 - 123
    - "Protein Delivery with Infusion Pumps", BREMER ET AL., Protein Delivery: Physical Systems, PLENUM PRESS, (1997), pages 239 - 254
    - "Delivery of Proteins from a Controlled Release Injectable Implant", YEWEY ET AL., Protein Delivery: Physical Systems, PLENUM PRESS, (1997), pages 93 - 117
    - BAKKER-WOUDENBERG ET AL., EUR. J. CLIN. MICROBIOL. INFECT. DIS., (1993), vol. 12, no. 1, page S61
    - KIM, DRUGS, (1993), vol. 46, page 618
    - "Site-Specific Drug Delivery Using Liposomes as Carriers", RANADE, Drug Delivery Systems, CRC PRESS, (1995), pages 3 - 24
    - OSTRO ET AL., AMERICAN J. HOSP. PHARM., (1989), vol. 46, page 1576
    - SCHERPHOF ET AL., ANN. NY. ACAD. SCI., (1985), vol. 446, page 368
    - CLAASSEN ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1984), vol. 802, page 428
    - ALLEN ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1991), vol. 1068, page 133
    - ALLEN ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1993), vol. 1150, page 9
    - KATO ET AL., BIOL. PHARM. BULL., (1993), vol. 16, page 960
    - SHIMIZU ET AL., BIOL. PHARM. BULL., (1997), vol. 20, page 881
    - KATO; SUGIYAMA, CRIT. REV. THER. DRUG CARRIER SYST., (1997), vol. 14, page 287
    - MURAHASHI ET AL., BIOL. PHARM. BULL., (1997), vol. 20, page 259
    - HARASYM, ADV. DRUG DELIV. REV., (1998), vol. 32, page 99
    - ANDERSON ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1981), vol. 31, page 1099
    - ANDERSON ET AL., CANCER RES., (1990), vol. 50, page 1853
    - COHEN ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1991), vol. 1063, page 95
    - "Preparation and Use of Liposomes in Immunological Studies", ALVING ET AL., Liposome Technology, CRC PRESS, (1993), vol. ILL, page 317
    - WASSEF ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 149, page 124
    - GOMBOTZ; PETTIT, BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1995), vol. 6, page 332
    - "Role of Polymers in Drug Delivery", RANADE, Drug Delivery Systems, CRC PRESS, (1995), pages 51 - 93
    - "Degradable Controlled Release Systems Useful for Protein Delivery", ROSKOS; MASKIEWICZ, Protein Delivery: Physical Systems, PLENUM PRESS, (1997), pages 45 - 92
    - BARTUS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 281, page 1161
    - PUTNEY; BURKE, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, page 153
    - PUTNEY, CURR. OPIN. CHEM. BIOL., (1998), vol. 2, page 548
    - GREF ET AL., PHARM. BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 10, page 167
Opposition   - LO et al., "Antibody Humanization by CDR Grafting", Antibody Engineering Methods and Protocols, (20040000), XP055259240