Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2473913

EP2473913 - AN ON LINE WEB PORTAL FOR PRIVATE NETWORK SERVICE PROVIDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2018New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Equinix, Inc.
301 Velocity Way 5th Floor
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
[2012/28]
Inventor(s)01 / WALDROP, Craig, Alan
3459 Wolverine Loop
Broomfield CO 80023 / US
02 / YOUN, Sukwan
1729 Valdez Way
Fremont CA 94539 / US
03 / PATTERSON, Lane, Gordon
6563 San Ignacio Avenue
San Jose CA 95119 / US
04 / FELBINGER, Kirk
3553 Cour De Jeune
San Jose CA 95148 / US
 [2012/28]
Representative(s)Manley, Nicholas Michael , et al
WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/20]Manley, Nicholas Michael , et al
WP Thompson
Coopers Building
Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Former [2012/28]Bartle, Robin Jonathan
W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool
L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date10814582.203.09.2010
WO2010US47878
Priority number, dateUS2010087504802.09.2010         Original published format: US 875048
US20090239997P04.09.2009         Original published format: US 239997 P
US20090285371P10.12.2009         Original published format: US 285371 P
US20100323066P12.04.2010         Original published format: US 323066 P
[2012/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011029042
Date:10.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2473913
Date:11.07.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011
[2012/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.03.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28
[2017/08]
Former International [2012/28]G06F9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/28]
TitleGerman:ONLINE-WEBPORTAL FÜR PRIVATE NETZWERKDIENSTANBIETER[2012/28]
English:AN ON LINE WEB PORTAL FOR PRIVATE NETWORK SERVICE PROVIDERS[2012/28]
French:PORTAIL WEB EN LIGNE POUR FOURNISSEURS DE SERVICES DE RÉSEAUX PRIVÉS[2012/28]
Entry into regional phase29.02.2012National basic fee paid 
29.02.2012Search fee paid 
29.02.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
29.02.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/28]
10.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0189142  (BAND X LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 19, line 19 - page 22, line 3 * * page 22, line 29 - page 23, line 30 * * page 25, line 28 - page 26, line 13 * * page 30, line 25 - page 31, line 13 * * figures 1, 2, 4-6 *;
 [A]WO2006115488  (CLISE PROPERTIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 8, line 21 - page 12, line 22 * * figures 2, 3 *
International search[Y]US2008049748  (BUGENHAGEN MICHAEL K [US], et al);
 [Y]US2004111429  (BOU-GHANNAM AKRAM A [US], et al);
 [Y]US2007291914  (BERGE HELENE [US], et al);
 [A]US2007291716  (MORALES BARROSO JOSE [ES]);
 [A]US7096193  (BEAUDOIN MICHAEL J [US], et al)