Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2470646

EP2470646 - STEROIDOGENESIS MODIFIED CELLS AND METHODS FOR SCREENING FOR ENDOCRINE DISRUPTING CHEMICALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.04.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.05.2014  [2014/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University Of Saskatchewan
Industry Liaison Office Box 5000 RPO University 501-121 Research Drive
Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7N 1K2 / CA
[2012/27]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Xiaowei
310 Stillwater Drive, 434
Saskatoon Saskatchewan S7J 4B6 / CA
02 / HECKER, Markus
RR5, Box 18
Site 515
Saskatoon Saskatchewan S7K 3J8 / CA
03 / GIESY, John, P.
RR5, Box 15, Site 515
Hidden Ridge
Range Road 3041
Saskatoon Saskatchewan S7K 3J8 / CA
 [2012/27]
Representative(s)Lahrtz, Fritz
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Prinzregentenstraße 68
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/33]Lahrtz, Fritz
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
Former [2012/27]Wichmann, Hendrik
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date10816530.916.09.2010
WO2010CA01460
Priority number, dateUS20090242822P16.09.2009         Original published format: US 242822 P
[2012/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2011032284
Date:24.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2470646
Date:04.07.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2011
[2012/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA24.03.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/10, C12N15/00, C12N15/52, C12N15/85, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50, G01N33/68, G01N33/74, G01N33/92
[2013/19]
Former International [2012/27]C12N5/10, C12N15/00, C12N15/52, C12N15/85, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, G01N33/68, G01N33/74, G01N33/92
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/27]
TitleGerman:DURCH STEROIDOGENESE MODIFIZIERTE ZELLEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCREENING NACH ENDOKRINEN DISRUPTIVEN CHEMIKALIEN[2012/27]
English:STEROIDOGENESIS MODIFIED CELLS AND METHODS FOR SCREENING FOR ENDOCRINE DISRUPTING CHEMICALS[2012/27]
French:CELLULES À STÉROÏDOGENÈSE MODIFIÉES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CRIBLAGE DE PRODUITS CHIMIQUES PERTURBATEURS ENDOCRINIENS[2012/27]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2012National basic fee paid 
30.03.2012Search fee paid 
30.03.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/27]
07.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/19]
13.12.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]  - Y. LIU ET AL, "Cytochrome P450 17 Hydroxylase/17,20 Lyase (CYP17) Function in Cholesterol Biosynthesis: Identification of Squalene Monooxygenase (Epoxidase) Activity Associated with CYP17 in Leydig Cells", MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (20050701), vol. 19, no. 7, doi:10.1210/me.2004-0271, ISSN 0888-8809, pages 1918 - 1931, XP055057007 [I] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/me.2004-0271
 [Y]  - Y. LIU ET AL, "Suppression of 11 -hydroxysteroid dehydrogenase type 1 with RNA interference substantially attenuates 3T3-L1 adipogenesis", PHYSIOLOGICAL GENOMICS, (20080201), vol. 32, no. 3, doi:10.1152/physiolgenomics.00067.2007, ISSN 1094-8341, pages 343 - 351, XP055057011 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/physiolgenomics.00067.2007
 [Y]  - GUGGENBERGER ET AL, "Functional analysis of cholesterol biosynthesis by RNA interference", JOURNAL OF STEROID BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD., OXFORD, GB, (20070501), vol. 104, no. 3-5, doi:10.1016/J.JSBMB.2007.03.001, ISSN 0960-0760, pages 105 - 109, XP022113856 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jsbmb.2007.03.001
 [T]  - X. ZHANG ET AL, "Bisphenol A Disrupts Steroidogenesis in Human H295R Cells", TOXICOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (20110601), vol. 121, no. 2, doi:10.1093/toxsci/kfr061, ISSN 1096-6080, pages 320 - 327, XP055057034 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/toxsci/kfr061
International search[A]  - NAKAMURA, Y. ET AL., "Type 5 17 p-hydroxysteroid dehydrogenase (AKRIC3) contributes to testosterone production in the adrenal reticularis", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM., (2009), vol. 94, pages 2192 - 2198, XP008119469

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/JC.2008-2374
 [A]  - HECKER, M. ET AL., "Novel trends in endocrine disruptor testing: the H295R steroidogenesis assay for identification of inducers and inhibitors of hormone production", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY., (2008), vol. 390, pages 287 - 291, XP019584754
 [A]  - MULLER-VIEIRA, U. ET AL., "The adrenocortical tumour cell line NCI-H295R as an in vitro screening system for evaluation of CYP11B2 (aldosterone synthase) and CYP11B1 (steroid-11beta-hydroxylase) inhibitors", JOURNAL OF STEROID BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY., (2005), vol. 96, pages 259 - 270, XP027785948
 [A]  - GRACIA, T. ET AL., "The H295R system for evaluation of endocrine disrupting effects", ECOTOXICOLOGY AND ENVIRONMENTAL SAFETY., (2006), vol. 65, pages 293 - 305, XP024940070

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ecoenv.2006.06.012
 [A]  - ZHANG, X. ET AL., "Quantitative RT-PCR methods for evaluating toxicant-induced effects on steroidogeneis using the H295R cell line", ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY., (2005), vol. 39, pages 2777 - 2785, XP008155547

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/es048679k
 [A]  - GRACIA, T. ET AL., "Modulation of steroidogenic gene expression and hormone production ofH295R cells by pharmaceuticals and environmentally active compounds", TOXICOLOGY AND APPLIED PHARMACOLOGY., (2007), vol. 225, pages 142 - 153, XP022345783

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.taap.2007.07.013